Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1417491

EP1417491 - A TEST STRIP FOR A LATERAL FLOW ASSAY FOR A SAMPLE CONTAINING WHOLE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.08.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.09.2012  [2012/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ReLia Diagnostics, Inc.
1700 Owens Street, Suite 515
San Francisco, California 94158 / US
[2010/15]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
Zhou, Siliang
One Market, Suite 1475, Steuart Tower
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/20]
Representative(s)Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02768331.718.07.2002
[2004/20]
WO2002US23164
Priority number, dateUS20010306660P18.07.2001         Original published format: US 306660 P
[2004/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03008933
Date:30.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1417491
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, G01N33/52
[2004/33]
Former International [2004/20]G01N33/543
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TESTSTREIFEN FÜR EINEN LATERALFLUSS-ASSAY FÜR EINE GANZE ZELLEN ENTHALTENDE PROBE[2004/20]
English:A TEST STRIP FOR A LATERAL FLOW ASSAY FOR A SAMPLE CONTAINING WHOLE CELLS[2004/20]
French:BANDE D'ESSAI POUR DOSAGE A ECOULEMENT LATERAL D'UN ECHANTILLON RENFERMANT DES CELLULES ENTIERES[2004/20]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2004National basic fee paid 
17.02.2004Search fee paid 
17.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
28.04.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/36]
22.03.2012Date of oral proceedings
16.04.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200504   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2005
31.07.200908   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US4816224  (BERGER DIETER ET AL) [X] 1-16,26-33,35-44 * col. 5, lines 31 - 50, col. col. 8, lines 27 - 66;; figures 30,31,8,9,21,23 *;
 [X]US5037736  (FREITAG HELMUT ET AL) [X] 1-13,15-33,35-44 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5211914  (FRITZ MICHAEL ET AL) [X] 1-16,26-33,35-44 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0062060  (CHIMERA RESEARCH AND CHEMICAL) [A] 14-23 * p. 9, lines 13 - 24, p. 10, line 10 - p. 13, line 26, Fig 1, 1A, 1B *
International search[X]US5602040  ;
 [X]US5234813  ;
 [X]US5656448  ;
 [X]US5712172  ;
 [X]US5766552  ;
 [X]US5821073  ;
 [X]US5985675  ;
 [X]US6001658  ;
 [X]WO9918439