EP1387923 - DRILL BIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? CY | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco MAI GmbH Werkstrasse 17 9710 Feistritz/Drau / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states Atlas Copco Mai GmbH Werkstrasse 17 9710 Feistritz/Drau / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPOUSEK, Herbert Dr. Zak-Str. 1 A-9524 St. Magdalen bei Villach / AT | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Hehenberger, Reinhard, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Hehenberger, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Otto Beer, Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer, Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger, Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02769438.9 | 16.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002AT00149 | Priority number, date | AT20010000789 | 17.05.2001 Original published format: AT 7892001 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02092957 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387923 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387923 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/36, E21B10/58, E21B10/38 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
E21B10/58 (EP,US);
E21B10/36 (EP,US);
E21B10/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | 24.11.2003 | LT | 24.11.2003 | LV | 24.11.2003 | MK | 24.11.2003 | RO | 24.11.2003 | SI | 24.11.2003 | Title | German: | BOHRKRONE | [2004/07] | English: | DRILL BIT | [2004/07] | French: | COURONNE DE SONDAGE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.11.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 30.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05005935.1 Application withdrawn : 11.05.2005 | EP05010556.8 / EP1564365 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.05.2006 | [2009/38] |
Former [2007/45] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/39] | IT | 31.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9719247 (TECHMO ENTW & VERTRIEBS GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10-13,16-19,22,24,26,33 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE927022 (ETSCHEL GUSTAV) [X] 1,2,9-12,15,22,24,27,28 * figures 3,4 *; | [XD]GB189021 (ARTHUR LEE HAWKESWORTH) [XD] 1,3-5,9,11,12,14,24,25 * figures 9-11 *; | [X]AU450556B (WICKMAN SOUTH AFRICA (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED) [X] 29-32,34-37,39 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB981489 (TUNGSTEN CARBIDE DEVELOPMENTS) [X] 29-32,34,35 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB633999 (ATLAS DIESEL AB) [X] 29-32,34,35 * figure 3 *; | [X]US4185708 (JANIKOWSKA-PAWLIK JADWIGA [PL], et al) [X] 29-32,34,35,40,41 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]FR1411867 (P & V MINING & ENGINEERING LTD) [X] 29,31,32,34-38 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | AT1513U | DE918741 | GB189021 |