Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1391025

EP1391025 - Linear compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/09]LINEAR MOTOR AND LINEAR COMPRESSOR INCLUDING SAID MOTOR
[2008/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL S.A.
Avenida das Nações Unidas 12995 32 andar - Brooklin Novo
04578-000 São Paulo SP / BR
[2006/34]
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
EMPRESA BRASILEIRA DE COMPRESSORES S/A - EMBRACO
Rua Rui Barbosa 1020
89219-901 Joinville, SC / BR
Inventor(s)01 / LILIE, Dietmar, Erich, Bernhard
Rua Orestes Guimaraes, 904
CEP-89204-060 Joinville, SC / BR
 [2004/09]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/03]Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Former [2004/09]Geyer, Werner, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date02769441.313.05.2002
[2004/09]
WO2002BR00068
Priority number, dateBR2001010256614.05.2001         Original published format: BR 0102566
[2004/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02093714
Date:21.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1391025
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1391025
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/18, H02K33/16, F04B35/04
[2004/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2008/35]
Former [2004/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Linearkompressor[2008/34]
English:Linear compressor[2008/34]
French:Compresseur linéaire[2008/34]
Former [2004/09]LINEARMOTOR UND LINEARKOMPRESSOR MIT DEM LINEARMOTOR
Former [2004/09]LINEAR MOTOR AND LINEAR COMPRESSOR INCLUDING SAID MOTOR
Former [2004/09]MOTEUR LINEAIRE ET COMPRESSEUR LINEAIRE COMPRENANT CE MOTEUR
Entry into regional phase29.10.2003National basic fee paid 
29.10.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
29.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2008Fee for grant paid
17.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US6209328  (KIM SEON YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 8 *;
 [X]EP0954086  (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 39, line 28 - line 30; figures 1,2,22,24 *;
 [X]JP2000297751  ;
 [X]JPH10285898  ;
 [DX]US5945748  (PARK JUNG SIK [KR], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,6 * figure 8 *;
 [X]WO0129444  (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, [X] 1-6 * abstract *