Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1551123

EP1551123 - PREDICTION OF UPLINK RECEIVED MAIN POWER AND ADMISION CONTROL IN CDMA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
518057 Shenzhen City
Guangdong Province / CN
[2017/26]
Former [2005/27]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
518057 Shenzhen City, Guandong Province / CN
Inventor(s)01 / DENG, Chunmei, @4th Fl., B 1 Wing
ZTE Plaza
Keji Rd S.
Hi-tech Ind. Park
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / HUANG, Chao, @7D Room, B Wing
Hua Qiang Garden
4 Fu Hong Road
Fu Tian District
Shenzhen, Guang Dong 518026 / CN
03 / XIONG, Jianqiu
4th Floor, B Wing, ZTE Plaza
Keji Park
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2017/26]
Former [2005/27]01 / DENG, Chunmei, 4th Fl., B 1 Wing
ZTE Plaza, Keji Rd S., Hi-tech Ind. Park
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / HUANG, Chao, 7D Room, B Wing
Hua Qiang Garden, 4 Fu Hong Road, Fu Tian District
Shenzhen, Guang Dong 518026 / CN
03 / XIONG, Jianqiu
4th Floor, B Wing, ZTE Plaza, Keji Park
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Edward James
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
P.O. Box 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
[2017/26]
Former [2005/27]Tomlinson, Edward James
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Application number, filing date02771997.028.09.2002
[2005/27]
WO2002CN00694
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004030253
Date:08.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1551123
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004
[2005/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1551123
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.04.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/00
[2005/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2017/26]
Former [2005/27]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORHERSAGE DER AUFWÄRTSSTRECKEN-EMPFANGSHAUPTLEISTUNG UND ZULASSUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINEM CDMA-SYSTEM[2005/27]
English:PREDICTION OF UPLINK RECEIVED MAIN POWER AND ADMISION CONTROL IN CDMA SYSTEM[2005/27]
French:PREDICTION D'UNE PUISSANCE PRINCIPALE RECUE DE LIAISON MONTANTE ET COMMANDE D'ADMISSION DANS UN SYSTEME AMCR[2005/27]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2005Translation filed 
21.04.2005National basic fee paid 
21.04.2005Search fee paid 
21.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
21.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/27]
09.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2017Fee for grant paid
16.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.10.2009
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
28.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GB28.09.2017
IE28.09.2017
LU28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
FR02.10.2017
[2018/37]
Former [2018/35]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GB28.09.2017
IE28.09.2017
LU28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
IE28.09.2017
LU28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/30]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
LU28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0193620  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 7 *;
 [A]EP1071306  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0014] - [0031] *;
 [A]US2002102986  (IWAMURA MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0017] *
 [X]  - KURI J ET AL, "CALL ADMISSION ON THE UPLINK OF A CDMA SYSTEM BASED ON TOTAL RECEIVED POWER", ICC '99. 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE RECORD. VANCOUVER, CA, JUNE 6 - 10, 1999; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19990606), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-5285-8, pages 1431 - 1436, XP000903610 [X] 1-3,10-14,21-24 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HJELM B, "Admission control in future multi-service wideband direct-sequence CDMA systems", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2000. IEEE VTS FALL VTC 2000. 52ND SEPT. 24-28, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000924), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-6507-0, pages 1086 - 1093, XP010524672 [X] 1-3,10-14,21-24 * abstract *
International search[A]CN1332545  (INST TELECOMM TRANSMISSION [CN]);
 [A]CN1361606  (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD SHENZHEN [CN]);
 [A]WO0004649  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al);
 [A]  - XU H-M ET AL, "Power Control During the Random Access procedure In the Third Generation Mobile Communication system TD-SCDMA", JOURNAL OF CHONGQING UNIVERSITY OF POSTS AND TELECOMMUNICATION, (200106), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 26 - 28, 35, XP008102353