Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1429819

EP1429819 - OPTIMIZED DOSING FOR PACLITAXEL COATED STENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/26]OPTIMIZED DOSING FOR DRUG COATED STENTS
[2010/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2011
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
[2010/47]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
Inventor(s)01 / BARRY, James, J.
35 Jackson Circle
Marlborough, MA / US
02 / KAMATH, Kalpana, R.
7 Langdon Road
Natick, MA 01760 / US
 [2004/26]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/13]Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2004/26]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date02773543.024.09.2002
[2004/26]
WO2002US30193
Priority number, dateUS20010324095P24.09.2001         Original published format: US 324095 P
[2004/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03035135
Date:01.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1429819
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003
[2004/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1429819
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/16, A61L31/10
[2010/22]
Former International [2004/26]A61L31/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2004/34]
Former [2004/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERTE DOSIERUNG BEI PACLITAXELHALTIGEN STENTS[2010/22]
English:OPTIMIZED DOSING FOR PACLITAXEL COATED STENTS[2010/22]
French:DOSAGE OPTIMISE POUR EXTENSEURS ENDUITS DE PACLITAXEL[2010/22]
Former [2004/26]OPTIMIERTE DOSIERUNG BEI MEDIKAMENTHALTIGEN STENTS
Former [2004/26]OPTIMIZED DOSING FOR DRUG COATED STENTS
Former [2004/26]DOSAGE OPTIMISE POUR EXTENSEURS ENDUITS D'UN MEDICAMENT
Entry into regional phase09.03.2004National basic fee paid 
09.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/26]
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
27.04.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2010Fee for grant paid
27.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.11.2010
[2011/24]
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0021584  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * claims 24,29,35-46 * * figure 10 *