blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1397071 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1397071



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 100
28.11.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.11.2002 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.12.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
05.12.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.12.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.12.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.05.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
10.10.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.10.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.10.2003 Priority document Search / examination 13
29.10.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Annex Search / examination 4
28.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
04.02.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
02.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
02.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.03.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.05.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.04.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1