Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1397071 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1397071



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 100
20.04.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.05.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.03.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.03.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
02.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
08.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
04.02.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.02.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
28.01.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Annex Search / examination 4
29.10.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Priority document Search / examination 13
29.10.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.10.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.05.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.04.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.04.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.04.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.12.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.12.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.12.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.12.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
28.11.2002 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.11.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3