blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1397071


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.05.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.06.2006  [2006/23]
29.04.2005 (Expected) grant published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
20.04.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.04.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.02.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.11.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.03.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
30.01.2004 Request for examination filed published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
21.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
03.12.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
11.11.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
31.01.2003 PCT data prior to European publication
06.12.2002 PCT data prior to European publication