blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1397071
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7011633Global Dossier 14.03.2006B2
US2004147967 29.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
SE0101917 31.05.2001
SE0200036 10.01.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1397071Global Dossier 15.06.2005B1
EP1397071 17.03.2004A1
Priority number Date
SE0101917 31.05.2001
SE0200036 10.01.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60204688T 18.05.2006T2
DE60204688D 21.07.2005D1
Priority number Date
SE0101917 31.05.2001
SE0200036 10.01.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO02096285Global Dossier 05.12.2002A1
Priority number Date
SE0101917 31.05.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SE0101917D 31.05.2001D0
Priority number Date
SE0101917 31.05.2001