Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1397071

EP1397071 - A BLOOD FLOW MEASURING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical AB
175 84 Järfälla / SE
[2004/12]
Inventor(s)01 / STRANDBERG, Hans
Landsvägen 51
S-172 36 Sundbyberg / SE
 [2004/12]
Application number, filing date02774086.910.01.2002
[2004/12]
WO2002SE00036
Priority number, dateSE2001000191731.05.2001         Original published format: SE 0101917
[2004/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02096285
Date:05.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1397071
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002
[2004/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1397071
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/026, A61N1/365
[2004/12]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IE,   IT,   LI [2005/24]
Former [2004/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:BLUTFLUSSMESSVORRICHTUNG[2004/12]
English:A BLOOD FLOW MEASURING APPARATUS[2004/12]
French:DEBITMETRE SANGUIN[2004/12]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2004National basic fee paid 
02.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
02.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2005Fee for grant paid
12.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8200581  ;
 [X]US4785823  ;
 [A]US4721115