EP1425055 - INTRAVASCULAR DEVICES, RETRIEVAL SYSTEMS, AND CORRESPONDING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rafael Medical Technologies Inc. Corporate Service Bureau 15 East North Street Dover, DE 19901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Rafael Medical Technologies Inc. Corporate Service Bureau, 15 East North Street Dover, DE 19901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCKHEIMER, Elchanan Eshkol St. 16 30900 Zichron Yaakov / IL | 02 /
BRUCKHEIMER, Simon 74 Church crescent London N10 3NE / GB | 03 /
TAVORI, Issack Yair Stern St. 22 46412 Herzlia / IL | 04 /
NAOR, Gil Hayarkonim St. 11 45830 Ramot Hashavim / IL | 05 /
KINARTY, Danny 80A Hatishby Street Haifa 34523 / IL | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02775169.2 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002IL00749 | Priority number, date | US20010318005P | 10.09.2001 Original published format: US 318005 P | US20010317925P | 10.09.2001 Original published format: US 317925 P | US20010317926P | 10.09.2001 Original published format: US 317926 P | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03022325 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425055 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/011 (EP,US);
A61F2/0103 (EP,US);
A61F2/0105 (EP,US);
A61F2002/016 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/24] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAVASKULÄRE VORRICHTUNGEN, WIEDERFINDUNGSSYSTEME UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | [2004/24] | English: | INTRAVASCULAR DEVICES, RETRIEVAL SYSTEMS, AND CORRESPONDING METHODS | [2004/24] | French: | DISPOSITIFS INTRAVASCULAIRES, SYSTEMES DE RECUPERATION ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANT | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2276325 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 19, line 20 - page 22, line 24; figures 1,2,4-8 *; | [Y]WO9612448 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 17, lines 11-20; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9836694 (COOK UROLOGICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, lines 4-11; figure 1 * * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 21 * * page 14, lines 15-21 *; | [Y]WO0016846 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0056245 (MICROVENA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,5* page 12, lines 3-21; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US6146404 (KIM HANNAH [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, lines 35-55 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 38; figure 2 *; | [ED]WO02089869 (RAFAEL MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES IN [US], et al) [ED] 1-5 * page 18, line 25 - page 19, line 21; figures 1-8 * | International search | [X]US4619246 (MOLGAARD-NIELSEN ARNE [DK], et al); | [X]US5782840 (NAKAO NAOMI L [US]) |