Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1441303

EP1441303 - INFORMATION PROCESSING TERMINAL OR CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2015/40]
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUKADA, Akira
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / TAMAI, Hironobu
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / SEKIYA, Shuichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / OSHIMA, Takuya
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/31]01 / FUKADA, Akira c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35, KITASHINAGAWA 6-CHOME
SHINAGAWA-KU, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / TAMAI, Hironobu c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35, KITASHINAGAWA 6-CHOME
SHINAGAWA-KU, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
03 / SEKIYA, Shuichi c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35, KITASHINAGAWA 6-CHOME
SHINAGAWA-KU, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
04 / OSHIMA, Takuya c/o SONY CORPORATION
7-35, KITASHINAGAWA 6-CHOME
SHINAGAWA-KU, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/31]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date02775325.010.10.2002
[2004/31]
WO2002JP10544
Priority number, dateJP2001033497031.10.2001         Original published format: JP 2001334970
[2004/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03038740
Date:08.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1441303
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003
[2004/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.05.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K17/00, G06K19/07, G06F1/00
[2004/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSENDGERÄT ODER STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2004/31]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING TERMINAL OR CONTROL METHOD THEREOF[2004/31]
French:TERMINAL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE[2004/31]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2003Translation filed 
27.06.2003National basic fee paid 
27.06.2003Search fee paid 
18.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/31]
21.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination27.07.2015Appeal received No.  T2113/15
28.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - RANKL W ET AL, "Handbuch der Chipkarten, Kapitel 5.1-5.7 und 7.1-7.8", HANDBUCH DER CHIPKARTEN. AUFBAU - FUNKTIONSWEISE - EINSATZ VON SMART CARDS, MUENCHEN : CARL HANSER VERLAG, DE, (19990101), ISBN 978-3-446-21115-5, page COMPLETE93, XP002290464 [Y] 1-7 * Sections 5.6, 5.7, 7.5, 7.6 *
 [Y]  - RANKL W ET AL, "Handbuch der Chipkarten, Kapitel 5.10", HANDBUCH DER CHIPKARTEN. AUFBAU - FUNKTIONSWEISE - EINSATZ VON SMART CARDS, MUENCHEN : CARL HANSER VERLAG, DE, (19990101), ISBN 978-3-446-21115-5, pages 252 - 281, XP002528960 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[YE]JP2003032330  ;
 [A]JP2001223631  ;
 [A]JP2001273528  ;
 [A]JPH11272809  ;
 [A]WO0054208