EP1487320 - ANESTHESIA DRUG MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 210 Park Building Salt Lake City, Utah 84112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF UTAH RESEARCH FOUNDATION 210 Park Building Salt Lake City, Utah 84112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTENSKOW, Dwayne 3439 E. Winesap Road Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | 02 /
AGUTTER, James 835 E. 600 South Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US | 03 /
SYROID, Noah 3611 East Kings Hill Circle Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | 04 /
STRAYER, David, Lee 336 F. Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | 05 /
ALBERT, Robert, William 1570 E. Emerson Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105-2728 / US | 06 /
DREWS, Frank 528 E. Emerson Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
WESTENSKOW, Dwayne 3439 E. Winesap Road Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | ||
02 /
AGUTTER, James 835 E. 600 South Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US | |||
03 /
SYROID, Noah 1204 Middlesex Road Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | |||
04 /
STRAYER, David, Lee 336 F. Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | |||
05 /
ALBERT, Robert, William 1570 E. Emerson Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105-2728 / US | |||
06 /
DREWS, Frank 528 E. Emerson Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | |||
Former [2004/52] | 01 /
WESTENSKOW, Dwayne 3439 E. Winesap Road Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | ||
02 /
AGUTTER, James 835 E. 600 South Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US | |||
03 /
SYROID, Noah 1204 Middlesex Road Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | |||
04 /
STRAYER, David, Lee 336 F. Street Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | |||
05 /
ALBERT, Robert, William 682 East 12th Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84103 / US | |||
06 /
DREWS, Frank 528 E. Emerson Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 02776215.2 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/52] | WO2002US32614 | Priority number, date | US20010328878P | 12.10.2001 Original published format: US 328878 P | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03030724 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487320 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06T11/20, A61B5/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G06T11/206 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
A61B5/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | G06G7/48 | ||
Former IPC [2004/52] | A61B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NARKOSEMITTEL-MONITOR | [2004/52] | English: | ANESTHESIA DRUG MONITOR | [2004/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR MEDICAMENT ANESTHESIANT | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 12.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO03030724 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [E] 1-26 * page 44, line 12 - page 45, line 13; figures 23-25 ** page 49, line 4 - line 13; figure 33 * | International search | [X]US5522798 (JOHNSON NOEL L [US], et al); | [XE]US6542858 (GRASS GEORGE M [US], et al); | [XE]US6647358 (GRASS GEORGE M [US], et al) | [X] - VAN MEURS W.L. ET AL, "Pharmacokinetic-Pharmacodynamic Model For Educational Simulations", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (1998), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 582 - 590, XP000740783 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/10.668748 |