Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1455706

EP1455706 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH PRINTED ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.07.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
401 North Lake Street Neenah
Wisconsin 54957-0349 / US
[2011/34]
Former [2004/38]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
401 North Lake Street
Neenah Wisconsin 54957-0349 / US
Inventor(s)01 / UITENBROEK, Duane, Girard
123 Homewood Court
Little Chute, WI 54140 / US
02 / VUKOS, John, Philip
7386 Darrow Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
03 / MORMAN, Michael, Tod
555 Kings Peak
Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US
04 / ROESSLER, Thomas, Harold
3023 East Fallcreek Lane
Appleton, Wisconson 54913 / US
05 / ODORZYNSKI, Thomas, Walter
255 Warren Court
Green Bay, WI 54301 / US
06 / GARVEY, Michael, Joseph
309 North Drew Street
Appleton, WI 54911 / US
 [2011/33]
Former [2004/49]01 / UITENBROEK, Duane, Girard
123 Homewood Court
Little Chute, WI 54140 / US
02 / VUKOS, John, Philip
7386 Darrow Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
03 / MORMAN, Michael, Tod
555 Kings Peak
Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US
04 / ROESSLER, Thomas, Harold
3023 East Fallcreek Lane
Appleton, WI 54913 / US
05 / ODORZYNSKI, Thomas, Walter
255 Warren Court
Green Bay, WI 54301 / US
06 / GARVEY, Michael, Joseph
309 North Drew Street
Appleton, WI 54911 / US
Former [2004/38]01 / UITENBROEK, Duane, Girard
123 Homewood Court
Little Chute, WI 54140 / US
02 / VUKOS, John, Philip
7386 Darrow Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
03 / MORMAN, Michael, Tod
555 Kings Peak
Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US
04 / ROESSLER, Thomas, Harold
1034 Greendale Court
Menasha, WI 54952 / US
05 / ODORZYNSKI, Thomas, Walter
255 Warren Court
Green Bay, WI 54301 / US
06 / GARVEY, Michael, Joseph
309 North Drew Street
Appleton, WI 54911 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2010/46]Ramsay, Laura Anne
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2004/38]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date02776295.425.10.2002
[2004/38]
WO2002US34184
Priority number, dateUS2001002499219.12.2001         Original published format: US 24992
[2004/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03053308
Date:03.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1455706
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003
[2004/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1455706
Date:24.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2004/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2011/34]
Former [2004/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL MIT GEDRUCKTEN ELASTOMERBÄNDERN[2004/38]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH PRINTED ELASTOMERS[2004/38]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT AVEC DES ELASTOMERES IMPRIMES[2004/38]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2004National basic fee paid 
25.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
09.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2011Fee for grant paid
08.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.05.2012  30.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
 02  22.05.2012  31.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB, et al
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [2018/27]
Former [2017/02]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.2012  30.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
 02  22.05.2012  31.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB, et al
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
Former [2012/27]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.2012  30.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
 02  22.05.2012  31.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
Former [2012/26]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.2012   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
02.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.01.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.03.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.03.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/33]
Appeal following opposition10.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0522/15
13.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
07.03.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
DE01.05.2012
[2015/21]
Former [2012/10]NL24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
Former [2012/08]NL24.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[DX]US6245050  (ODORZYNSKI THOMAS WALTER ET AL) [DX] 1-18 * claims 1-9 * * column 2, line 8 - line 26 * * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 49 * * column 6, line 62 - line 67 * * column 7, line 16 - line 25 * * example 1 *