Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1430433 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1430433



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 259
29.09.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
22.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.09.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
21.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.05.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
19.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Claims Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.02.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
20.02.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.01.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.05.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
08.06.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
29.05.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 2
02.09.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.04.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
22.03.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
19.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.11.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
12.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
12.11.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 14
12.11.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
12.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.09.2010 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.09.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.09.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.09.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
28.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
21.06.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.06.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.06.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.05.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
19.05.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
19.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
04.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
04.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
29.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
17.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
13.05.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.05.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.05.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
24.02.2004 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.02.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.11.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
30.10.2003 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
28.07.2003 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.07.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.07.2003 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.07.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.05.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.05.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.04.2003 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 14
01.04.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
30.12.2002 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
09.10.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
09.10.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 2
09.10.2002 Description International Searching Authority 8
09.10.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 2
09.10.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 1