Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1430084 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1430084



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 476
22.03.2013 Closing of application Search / examination 2
04.12.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.11.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.08.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.08.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
16.04.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.12.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.12.2011 Text: Decision / Communication Appeal 18
07.12.2011 Text: Decision / Communication Search / examination 18
05.12.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.11.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.09.2011 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
15.09.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.09.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.03.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.03.2011 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
04.03.2011 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
02.03.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.02.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.02.2011 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.11.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.03.2010 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
04.11.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
29.09.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
08.05.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
22.04.2008 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 3
21.04.2008 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 3
05.03.2008 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 7
03.03.2008 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 7
05.02.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
24.09.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.09.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
18.09.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
24.08.2007 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 1
24.08.2007 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 5
13.08.2007 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Appeal 1
11.08.2007 Annex Search / examination 2
11.08.2007 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
08.08.2007 Annex Search / examination 2
08.08.2007 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
03.08.2007 Request for change of representative Appeal 3
01.06.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.05.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
21.05.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.04.2007 Annex Appeal 1
17.04.2007 Claims Appeal 2
17.04.2007 Claims Appeal 2
17.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
16.02.2007 Claims Appeal 2
16.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.02.2007 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.01.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.12.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.12.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.12.2006 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.12.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
07.12.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 2
09.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
09.11.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 25
27.10.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 25
26.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
26.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
26.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
26.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
04.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
04.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
04.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 7
10.08.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
13.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
02.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.09.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
01.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
04.07.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.06.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 5
22.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
22.04.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.08.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
15.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
12.05.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.05.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.04.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.04.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.04.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.02.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.08.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
07.08.2003 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
27.03.2003 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 40
10.03.2003 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
05.03.2003 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 1
11.10.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.10.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 2
11.10.2002 Description International Searching Authority 21
11.10.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 9
11.10.2002 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 7