blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1449822

EP1449822 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANS-1,4-CYCLOHEXANE DICARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.02.2012  [2012/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
[2011/08]
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo
108-0014 / JP
Former [2004/35]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ENDOU, Koetsu, Mitsubishi Chem. Group Sc. & Tech.
1000, Kamoshidacho Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Hirofumi, Mitsubishi Chemical Corp.
10, Ushiodori 3-chome
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8054 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Shinichi
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1, Toho-cho
Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8530 / JP
 [2011/08]
Former [2004/35]01 / ENDOU, Koetsu, Mitsubishi Chem. Group Sc. & Tech.
1000, Kamoshidacho Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Hirofumi, Mitsubishi Chemical Corp.
10, Ushiodori 3-chome
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8054 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Shinichi, Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/35]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02777949.524.10.2002
[2004/35]
WO2002JP11058
Priority number, dateJP2001032910126.10.2001         Original published format: JP 2001329101
JP2001036995904.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001369959
JP2002011304716.04.2002         Original published format: JP 2002113047
JP2002014930223.05.2002         Original published format: JP 2002149302
[2004/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03035597
Date:01.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1449822
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1449822
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.05.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2006
ClassificationIPC:C07C61/09, C07C51/353
[2004/35]
CPC:
C07C51/353 (EP,KR,US); C07C51/363 (EP,US); C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C51/353, C07C61/09 (EP,US);
C07C51/363, C07C61/09 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE [2011/08]
Former [2004/35]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRANS-1,4-CYCLOHEXANDICARBONSÄURE[2004/35]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANS-1,4-CYCLOHEXANE DICARBOXYLIC ACID[2004/35]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE TRANS-1, 4- CYCLOHEXANEDICARBOXYLIQUE[2004/35]
Entry into regional phase26.04.2004Translation filed 
26.05.2004National basic fee paid 
26.05.2004Search fee paid 
26.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
26.04.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/35]
19.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2010Fee for grant paid
22.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPS4981349  ;
 [X]JPS4982648  ;
 [X]JPS5010581B
ExaminationJPS5010581
 JPS4981349
 JPS4982648
    - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 20, Database accession no. 1975-33487W, & JPS5010581 A 19750422 (TORAY IND INC)
    - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1974, no. 46, Database accession no. 1974-80037V, & JPS4981349 A 19740806 (NIKKO RIKAGAKU SANGYO CO)
    - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1974, no. 50, Database accession no. 1974-86234V, & JPS4982648 A 19740808 (NIKKO RIKAGAKU SANGYO CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.