EP1455689 - ORBITAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eyeborn (Proprietary) Limited Building 34, CSIR Campus Meiring Naude Road Brummeria Pretoria 0184 / ZA | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states CSIR Corporate Building, Scientia Pretoria 0002 / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Paul, Wilhelm 718 Umhlanga Street 0153 Wingate Park / ZA | 02 /
THOMAS, Michael Edward 84 Coghill Road, Lynnwood Glen 0081 Pretoria / ZA | 03 /
TALMA, Jan 241 Bootes Street, Waterkloof Ridge 0181 Pretoria / ZA | 04 /
GOUS, Petrus Nicolaas Jacobus 314 Edward Street, Waterkloof 0181 Pretoria / ZA | 05 /
ROUX, Paul 70 Marais Street Brooklyn, 0181 Pretoria / ZA | 06 /
MINNAAR, Mark 245 Loveday Street Muckleneuk, 0002 Pretoria / ZA | 07 /
LEVITZ, Lewis Mark 504 Vaude, 18 Waverley Road, Gresswold 2090 Johannesburg / ZA | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02779803.2 | 29.10.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002IB04481 | Priority number, date | ZA20010008961 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: ZA 200108961 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03037155 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455689 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455689 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/14 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61F2/141 (EP,US);
C04B35/447 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B38/0054 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00836 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/00, C04B35/447, C04B38/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORBITALIMPLANTAT | [2004/38] | English: | ORBITAL IMPLANT | [2004/38] | French: | IMPLANT ORBITAIRE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | BG | 22.05.2007 | LU | 29.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 21.02.2007 | |
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | EE | 21.02.2007 | |
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SK | 21.02.2007 | |
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | SK | 21.02.2007 | |
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
BG | 22.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | SE | 21.05.2007 | |
BG | 22.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5089021 (VACHET JEAN-MARC [FR]); | [A]US5330529 (CEPELA MARK A [US]); | [A]US5466259 (DURETTE JEAN-FRANCOIS [CA]); | [A]US5584880 (MARTINEZ MIGUEL [US]); | [A]US5713955 (DURETTE JEAN-FRANCOIS [CA]) |