EP1466905 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE OXOHEPTENOIC ACID ESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kandanishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/09] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Kowa Hitotsubashi Bldg, 7-1, Kandanishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | ||
For all designated states SANKYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 15-10, Nihonbashikobuna-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo103-0024 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIUCHI, Takashi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Masamichi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 03 /
KONDO, Shoichi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. 722-1 Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 04 /
SOEJIMA, Tadashi, c/o Sankyo Chemical Ind. Ltd. 4-8, Nishiyawata 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0073 / JP | 05 /
UMEO, Kazuhiro, c/o Sankyo Chemical Ind. Ltd. 4-8, Nishiyawata 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0073 / JP | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02780087.9 | 14.11.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002JP11870 | Priority number, date | JP20010348569 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001348569 | [2004/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03042180 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466905 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466905 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/14 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
C07D215/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG OPTISCH AKTIVER OXOHEPTENSÄUREESTER | [2004/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE OXOHEPTENOIC ACID ESTER | [2004/42] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ESTER D'ACIDE OXOHEPTONOIQUE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2004 | Translation filed | 07.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 10.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0892217 (UBE INDUSTRIES, et al); | [A] - SORIENTE A. ET AL., "Enantioselective aldol condensation of 1,3-bis(trimethylsilyloxy)-1-methoxy-buta-1,3-diene promoted by chiral Ti(IV)/BINOL complex", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2000), vol. 11, no. 11, pages 2255 - 2258, XP004205785 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)00200-7 | [A] - SORIENTE A. ET AL., "An efficient asymmetric aldol reaction of Chan's diene promoted by chiral Ti(IV)-BINOL complex", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2001), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 959 - 963, XP004241721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00150-1 | Examination | - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1996), Database accession no. 1996:409680 |