Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1481114

EP1481114 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL PROCESSING OF MICROELECTRONIC WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEMITOOL, INC.
655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell
Montana 59901 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]For all designated states
SEMITOOL, INC.
655 West Reserve Drive
Kalispell, Montana 59901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HANSON, Kyle, M. Semitool, Inc.
655 West Reserve Drive
Kalispell, MT 59901 / US
 [2004/49]
Representative(s)Kühn, Armin
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]Kühn, Armin
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2004/49]Walker, Ross Thomson
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02780265.103.09.2002
[2004/49]
WO2002US28071
Priority number, dateUS20010316597P31.08.2001         Original published format: US 316597 P
[2004/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03018874
Date:06.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1481114
Date:01.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.04.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:C25B11/00, C25B15/00, C25C7/02, C25D17/00, C25D17/10
[2004/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN VERARBEITUNG VON MIKROELEKTRONISCHEN WERKSTÜCKEN[2004/49]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL PROCESSING OF MICROELECTRONIC WORKPIECES[2004/49]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT ELECTROCHIMIQUE DE PIECES MICROELECTRONIQUES[2004/49]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2004National basic fee paid 
01.03.2004Search fee paid 
16.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
26.09.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/27]
17.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200403   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US6179983  (REID JONATHAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17,29,30,34,35,37 * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 51 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [E]WO02097165  (SEMITOOL INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3,4,24,25,28-30 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4238310  (ECKLER THOMAS A [US], et al);
 [A]US5256262  (BLOMSTERBERG KARL-INGEMAR [SE])