Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1444036

EP1444036 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ZIRCONIUM-CERIUM-BASED MIXED OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magnesium Elektron Ltd.
The Victoria, Harbour City, Salford Quays
Manchester M5 2SP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/33]For all designated states
Magnesium Elektron Ltd.
The Victoria, Harbour City, Salford Quays
Manchester M5 2SP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAO, Yasuhide, Shimizu Works
Nippon Light Metal Co., Ltd., 4025-1, Miho
Shimizu, Shizuoka, 424-09 01 / JP
02 / NORMAN, Colin
MEL Chemicals, PO Box 6, Lumn's Lane
Swinton, Manchester M27 8LS / GB
03 / EDWARDS, Gavin
MEL Chemicals, PO Box 6, Lumn's Lane
Swinton, Manchester M27 8LS / GB
04 / CHISEM, Ian
MEL Chemicals, PO Box 6, Lumn's Lane
Swinton, Manchester M27 8LS / GB
 [2004/33]
Representative(s)Wise, Stephen James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Wise, Stephen James , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
Former [2004/33]Wise, Stephen James , et al
c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK, Raworth House, 36 Sydenham Road
Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
Application number, filing date02781390.630.10.2002
[2004/33]
WO2002GB04915
Priority number, dateJP2001033670301.11.2001         Original published format: JP 2001336703
[2004/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03037506
Date:08.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1444036
Date:11.08.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003
[2004/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1444036
Date:31.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/06, B01J23/10, B01J35/00, B01J37/03, B01D53/94
[2004/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF BASIS VON ZIRKONIUM- UND CERMISCHOXIDEN[2004/33]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING ZIRCONIUM-CERIUM-BASED MIXED OXIDES[2004/33]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'OXYDES MIXTES A BASE DE ZIRCONIUM ET DE CERIUM[2005/03]
Former [2004/33]PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'OXYDES MELANGES A BASE DE ZIRCONIUM ET DE CERIUM
Entry into regional phase15.05.2004National basic fee paid 
15.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
12.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2005Fee for grant paid
29.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
EE31.08.2005
ES31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
SK31.08.2005
TR31.08.2005
CY30.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
[2007/20]
Former [2007/11]CH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
EE31.08.2005
ES31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
SK31.08.2005
TR31.08.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/52]CH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
SK31.08.2005
TR31.08.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/48]CH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
SK31.08.2005
MC31.10.2005
IE01.11.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/30]CH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
SK31.08.2005
MC31.10.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/29]CH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
SK31.08.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/26]CH31.08.2005
CZ31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
BG30.11.2005
DK30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/25]CH31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
BG30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
PT22.02.2006
Former [2006/22]CH31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
NL31.08.2005
BG30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]CH31.08.2005
LI31.08.2005
BG30.11.2005
GR30.11.2005
Former [2006/13]BG30.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1035074  (DAIICHI KIGENSO KAGAKU CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0017] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031] , [0035] - [0037] - [0041] , [0045] - [0047] - [0055] - [0059] * * figure 1; claim - *;
 [X]EP0963951  (DAIICHI KIGENSO KAGAKU CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0025] , [0027] , [0030] - [0036] - [0040] , [0041] , [0045] - [0049] * * claim - *;
 [XA]WO9924153  (HEDOUIN CATHERINE ;SEGUELONG THIERRY (FR); RHONE POULENC CHIMIE (F) [X] 14-17 * abstract * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 21 - line 25 * * example 1 * * claim 9 * [A] 1-13;
 [XA]FR2756819  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE) [X] 14-17 * example 2 * [A] 1-13;
 [A]WO9816472  (RHONE POULENC INC) [A] 1-17 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 11 * * abstract *
ExaminationWO9702213
 JPH11292539