blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1432993

EP1432993 - In vitro evaluation method for priocidal (anti-prion) treatments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/27]IN VITRO MODEL FOR PRIOCIDAL ACTIVITY
[2011/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STERIS INC.
43425 Business Park Drive
Temecula, CA 92590 / US
[2012/17]
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
STERIS INC.
43425 Business Park Drive
Temecula, California 92590 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ANTLOGA, Kathleen, M.
10346 Wilson Hills Road
Chardon, OH 44024 / US
02 / MCDONNELL, Gerald, E.
10 Beaconsfield Road
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG213DP / GB
 [2004/35]
Former [2004/27]01 / ANTLOGA, Kathleen, M.
10346 Wilson Hills Road
Chardon, OH 44024 / US
02 / MCDONNELL, Gerald, E.
205 Water Street
Chardon, OH 44024 / US
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/26]Helbing, Jörg
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2004/27]Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys.
Aggerstrasse 24
50859 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date02782119.804.10.2002
[2004/27]
WO2002US31872
Priority number, dateUS20010327460P05.10.2001         Original published format: US 327460 P
[2004/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO03031987
Date:17.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1432993
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1432993
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/327, A61L2/00, A61L2/14, C11D3/39, C11D11/00, A61L2/18, A61L2/20
[2011/42]
CPC:
A61L2/186 (EP,US); A61K31/327 (EP,US); A61L2/0082 (EP,US);
A61L2/0088 (EP,US); A61L2/14 (EP,US); A61L2/208 (EP,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US); C11D3/3947 (EP,US); A61L2202/17 (EP,US);
A61L2202/24 (EP,US); C11D2111/14 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2004/27]G01N33/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/27]
TitleGerman:In vitro Verfahren, um gegen Prionen gerichtete Behandlungen abzuschätzen[2011/42]
English:In vitro evaluation method for priocidal (anti-prion) treatments[2011/42]
French:Méthode d'évaluation in vitro de traitements anti-prions[2011/42]
Former [2004/27]IN VITRO MODEL FÜR ANTIPRIONEN AKTIVITÄT
Former [2004/27]IN VITRO MODEL FOR PRIOCIDAL ACTIVITY
Former [2004/27]MODELE IN VITRO D'ACTIVITE ANTIPRIONS
Entry into regional phase20.04.2004National basic fee paid 
20.04.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/27]
20.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
15.09.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2012Fee for grant paid
09.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2007
Opposition(s)28.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
07.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
10.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
LU04.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/34]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/33]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
IE04.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/24]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/09]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
Former [2012/48]FI25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0071575  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1,16,20 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0100235  (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [A] 1,16,20 * example - *;
 [PX]FR2814177  (UNIV GRENOBLE 1 [FR]) [PX] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - BURDON, D.W. ET AL, "Replication of IFDO on a chemically defined medium", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. 1996:418621, XP002249888 [A] 1,16 * abstract *
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 10 - 15
ExaminationUS7001873
    - DYAS A.C.; BURDON D.W., "Studies of a novel agent possessing resistance to moist heat and disinfectants parallels with Creutzfeldt-Jakob agent", JOURNAL OF HOSPITAL INFECTION, (1990), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0195-6701, pages 265 - 272, XP008079671

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0195-6701(90)90034-L
    - ANTLOGA K. ET AL, "Prion disease and medical devices", ASAIO JOURNAL, USA, (20001101), vol. 46, no. 6, pages S69 - S72, XP001092854

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002480-200011000-00040
    - ERNST D.R.; RACE R.E., "Comparative analysis of scrapie agent inactivation methods", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, NETHERLANDS, (19930201), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 193 - 201, XP000865557

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-0934(93)90126-C
    - ZOBELEY E. ET AL, "Infectivity of scrapie prions bound to a stainless steel surface.", MOLECULAR MEDICINE (CAMBRIDGE, MASS.), USA, (19990401), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 240 - 243, XP001119947
    - BURDON D.W., "A novel replicating agent isolated from the human intestinal tract having characteristics shared with Creutzfeldt-Jakob and related agents", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, ENGLAND, (198906), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 145 - 157, XP008099913
    - TAYLOR D.M., "Inactivation of transmissible degenerative encephalopathy agents: A review.", VETERINARY JOURNAL, ENGLAND, (200001), vol. 159, no. 1, pages 10 - 17, XP008012858

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/tvjl.1999.0406
by applicant   - JOURNAL OF HOSPITAL INFECTION, (1990), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 265 - 272
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.