Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1463491

EP1463491 - THIN FILM WITH NON-SELF-AGGREGATING UNIFORM HETEROGENEITY, PROCESS FOR THER PRODUCTION AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MonoSolRX, LLC
6560 Melton Road
Portage IN 46368 / US
[2012/37]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
MonoSolRX, LLC
6580 Melton Road
Portage IN 46368 / US
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
MonoSolRX, LLC
1142 Walker Road
Great Falls, VA 22066 / US
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
Kosmos Pharma
1142 Walker Road
Great Falls, VA 22066 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Robert, K.
138-10 Franklin Avenue, Apt. 2C
Flushing, NY 11355 / US
02 / FUISZ, Richard, C.
1287 Ballentrae Farm Drive
McLean, VA 22101 / US
03 / MYERS, Gary, L.
908 Colfax Avenue
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
04 / FUISZ, Joseph, M.
5700 Cricket Place
McLean, VA 22101 / US
 [2004/41]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/08]Nash, David Allan , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2011/20]Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. , et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2004/41]Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date02782151.111.10.2002
[2004/41]
WO2002US32575
Priority number, dateUS20010328868P12.10.2001         Original published format: US 328868 P
US2002007427214.02.2002         Original published format: US 74272
US20020386937P07.06.2002         Original published format: US 386937 P
[2004/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03030882
Date:17.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1463491
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003
[2004/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1463491
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/70, A61K9/00
[2004/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/41]
TitleGerman:DÜNNER FILM OHNE SELBTAGGREGATION MIT GLEICHMÄSSIGER HETEROGENITÄT, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, SOWIE DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARZNEISTOFFABGABESYSTEME[2004/41]
English:THIN FILM WITH NON-SELF-AGGREGATING UNIFORM HETEROGENEITY, PROCESS FOR THER PRODUCTION AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS MADE THEREFROM[2004/41]
French:FILM MINCE POURVU D'UNE HETEROGENEITE UNIFORME NON AUTOAGGLOMERANTE, SON PROCEDE D'ELABORATION ET SYSTEMES D'ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENTS AINSI PRODUITS[2004/41]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2004National basic fee paid 
04.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
21.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
17.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2012Fee for grant paid
01.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10182204.7  / EP2351557
EP19169349.8
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.06.2013  28.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Germann, Sandra
Silcherstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Gille Hrabal, et al
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.06.2013  28.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Acino Pharma AG
Dornacherstr. 114
4147 Aesch / CH
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [2016/45]
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  11.06.2013   
Germann, Sandra
Silcherstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Gille Hrabal, et al
Patentanwälte
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.06.2013   
Acino Pharma AG
Dornacherstr. 114
4147 Aesch / CH
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
19.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0525/17
16.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.07.2004M01   Fee paid on   21.07.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
LU11.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
PT14.01.2013
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
BG12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/24]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
Former [2013/23]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
Former [2013/22]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
Former [2013/20]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
Former [2013/09]FI12.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO0191721  (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [PX] 1-76 * example 8 *;
 [XD]US6284264  (ZERBE HORST GEORG [US], et al) [XD] 1-76 * column 4, lines 7-11 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US5393528  (STAAB ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-76 * column 11, lines 1-6,41-47 *;
 [X]EP1110546  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [X] 1-76 * page 4, lines 32-37 *;
 [XD]US4849246  (SCHMIDT WOLFGANG [DE]) [XD] 1-76 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0514691  (EURORESEARCH SRL [IT]) [X] 1-76 * page 4, column 2 *;
 [X]US4925670  (SCHMIDT WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1-79 * page 4, line 65 - page 5, line 2 *;
 [AD]US5629003  (HORSTMANN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [AD] 1-76 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4136145  (FUCHS PETER, et al) [DA] 1-76 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4631837  (MAGOON RICHARD E [US]) [AD] 1-76 * the whole document *