Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1453521

EP1453521 - ORAL CONTRACEPTIVES TO PREVENT PREGNANCY AND DIMINISH PREMENSTRUAL SYMPTOMATOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Theramex HQ UK Limited
75 King William Street
London, EC4N 7BE / GB
[2018/37]
Former [2010/41]For all designated states
Teva Women's Health, Inc.
400 Chestnut Ridge Road
Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US
Former [2005/29]For all designated states
Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2 Quaker Road
Pomona, NY 10970 / US
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
2 Quaker Road, Box 2900
Pomona, NY 10970 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BELL, Robert, G., @c/o Barr Research
One Bala Plaza,Suite 324
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US
02 / BEN-MAIMON, Carole, @c/o Barr Research
One Bala Plaza,Suite 324
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US
03 / ISKOLD, Beata, @c/o Barr Laboratories, Inc.
2 Quaker Road,Box 2900
Pomona, NY 10970 / US
 [2013/36]
Former [2004/37]01 / BELL, Robert, G., c/o Barr Research
One Bala Plaza,Suite 324
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US
02 / BEN-MAIMON, Carole, c/o Barr Research
One Bala Plaza,Suite 324
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US
03 / ISKOLD, Beata, c/o Barr Laboratories, Inc.
2 Quaker Road,Box 2900
Pomona, NY 10970 / US
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/40]
Former [2013/36]Clarke, Lionel Paul , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2009/17]Clarke, Lionel Paul , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2006/01]Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2004/37]Chapman, Paul William , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date02782404.404.12.2002
[2004/37]
WO2002US38602
Priority number, dateUS20010335807P05.12.2001         Original published format: US 335807 P
[2004/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03049744
Date:19.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1453521
Date:08.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003
[2004/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1453521
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/56, A61K31/567, A61K31/57, A61K31/138, A61P15/18, A61P25/24, A61K31/565, A61K45/06
[2016/16]
Former International [2012/15]A61K31/567, A61K31/138, A61P15/18, A61P25/24, A61K31/565, A61K45/06
Former International [2004/37]A61K31/567, A61K31/138, A61P15/18, A61P25/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/37]
Extension statesAL05.07.2004
LT05.07.2004
LV05.07.2004
MK05.07.2004
RO05.07.2004
TitleGerman:ORALE KONTRAZEPTIVA ZUM VERMEIDEN DER SCHWANGERSCHAFT UND VERMINDERUNG VON PRAEMENSTRUELLEN SYMPTOMEN[2004/37]
English:ORAL CONTRACEPTIVES TO PREVENT PREGNANCY AND DIMINISH PREMENSTRUAL SYMPTOMATOLOGY[2004/37]
French:CONTRACEPTIFS ORAUX POUR EVITER LES GROSSESSES ET DIMINUER LA SYMPTOMATOLOGIE PREMENSTRUELLE[2004/37]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2004National basic fee paid 
05.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/37]
24.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2010
17.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2013Fee for grant paid
25.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10181459.8  / EP2305229
EP10181464.8  / EP2305230
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Bröcher, Dirk Joachim
Roswithastraße 11
45131 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
C/La Vallina s/n.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera
Leon
24008 Villaquilambre / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph, et al
Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB
Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
 [2020/01]
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Bröcher, Dirk Joachim
Roswithastraße 11
41531 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.06.2014  11.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
C/La Vallina s/n.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera
Leon
24008 Villaquilambre / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph, et al
Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB
Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
11.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition22.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1428/16
22.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1428/16
19.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1428/16
12.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:05.11.2007Request for further processing filed
05.11.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.11.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.12.2018
CZ04.12.2018
LU04.12.2018
SK04.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
EE31.12.2018
MC02.01.2019
PT04.06.2019
GR02.07.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/49]CY04.12.2018
CZ04.12.2018
LU04.12.2018
SK04.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
EE31.12.2018
MC02.01.2019
PT04.06.2019
Former [2019/40]CY04.12.2018
CZ04.12.2018
LU04.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
MC02.01.2019
PT04.06.2019
Former [2019/39]CY04.12.2018
CZ04.12.2018
LU04.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
PT04.06.2019
Former [2019/37]CY04.12.2018
CZ04.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
PT04.06.2019
Former [2019/35]CY04.12.2018
CZ04.12.2018
PT04.06.2019
Former [2019/33]PT04.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9804267  (AMERICAN HOME PROD) [X] 35-40,52-55,57-60 * page 11; example 2 *;
 [X]US5858405  (GAST MICHAEL J) [X] 35-40,52-55,57-60 * column 10, line 11 - line 65 *;
 [X]WO9804266  (AMERICAN HOME PROD) [X] 35-40,52-55,57-60 * page 12, line 1 - line 16 *;
 [PA]WO0203975  (AMERICAN HOME PROD) [PA] 1-60 * page 2, line 15 *;
 [X]  - FREEMAN ET AL., "CONCURRENT USE OF ORAL CONTRACEPTIVES WITH ANTIDEPRESSANTS FOR PMS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (200110), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 540 - 542, XP009008308 [X] 1-60 * page 541; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004714-200110000-00018
 [A]  - KUPPER ET AL., "CURRENT THERAPEUTIC ASPECTS OF PMS", DEUTSCHE APOTHEKER ZEITUNG, (1996), vol. 136, no. 24, pages 23 - 26,29, XP001146366 [A] 1-60 * page 26; table 5 *
 [A]  - DAUGHERTY J.E., "TREATMENT STRATEGIES FOR PMS", AMERICAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN, (1998), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 183 - 192,197,198, XP009008307 [A] 1-60 * the whole document *