blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1423937

EP1423937 - Method for making secure a secret quantity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/23]METHOD FOR MAKING SECURE A SECRET QUANTITY
[2013/33]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2014  [2014/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
Morpho
Le Ponant de Paris
27 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/33]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
Morpho
Le Ponant de Paris, 27 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2007/51]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
SAGEM Sécurité
Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2006/33]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
SAGEM Défense Sécurité
Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
For all designated states
SAGEM SA
27, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LIARDET, Pierre-Yvan
56, rue du Pralou, Lotissement L'Audiguier
F-13790 Peynier / FR
02 / CHABANNE, Hervé
48, Rue de la Marne
F-78200 Mantes la Jolie / FR
 [2004/23]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]de Beaumont, Michel
Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date02785487.604.09.2002
[2004/23]
WO2002FR03007
Priority number, dateFR2001001143004.09.2001         Original published format: FR 0111430
[2004/23]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO03024017
Date:20.03.2003
Language:FR
[2003/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1423937
Date:02.06.2004
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/06
[2004/23]
CPC:
H04L9/0625 (EP,US); H04L9/004 (EP,US); G06F2207/7219 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2013/33]
Former [2004/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Absicherung einer Geheimzahl[2013/33]
English:Method for making secure a secret quantity[2013/33]
French:Procédé de sécurisation d'une quantité secrete[2013/33]
Former [2004/23]VERFAHREN ZUR ABSICHERUNG EINER GEHEIMZAHL
Former [2004/23]METHOD FOR MAKING SECURE A SECRET QUANTITY
Former [2004/23]PROCEDE DE SECURISATION D'UNE QUANTITE SECRETE
Entry into regional phase30.03.2004National basic fee paid 
30.03.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/23]
15.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/22]
14.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
24.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201312   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]  - LIH-YANG WANG; CHI-SUNG LAIH; HANG-GENG TSAI; NERN-MIN HUANG, "On the hardware design for DES cipher in tamper resistant devices against differential fault analysis", 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, PROCEEDINGS, Geneva, Switzerland, (20000531), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5482-6, pages 697 - 700, XP002202154 [A] 1-10 * page 699 - page 700 *
 [A]  - KALISKI, ROBSHAW, "Comments on Some New Attacks on Cryptographic Devices", RSA LABORATORIES' BULLETIN, NUMBER 5, (19970714), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://citeseer.nj.nec.com/cs, (20020613), XP002202155 [A] 1-10 * page 3, column L *
 [A]  - BORST J ET AL, "Cryptography on smart cards", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010716), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 423 - 435, XP004304907 [A] 1-10 * page 429, column R - page 430, column L * * page 431, column R - page 432, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(01)00164-5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.