Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1493162 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1493162



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 386
02.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
02.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
20.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
16.11.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 14
03.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.08.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
14.08.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.08.2014 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 23
11.08.2014 Data sheet for the decision Search / examination 23
23.05.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.05.2014 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 20
23.05.2014 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 20
05.05.2014 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
05.05.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
11.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Claims Appeal 2
11.04.2014 Drawings Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 8
14.03.2014 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
13.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
06.03.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.01.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.01.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.02.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.03.2010 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
29.01.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.12.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.11.2009 Claims Appeal 3
06.11.2009 Claims Appeal 2
06.11.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.11.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
31.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.07.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
07.07.2009 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.07.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
07.07.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 2
06.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.06.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.06.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.05.2009 Annex Search / examination 23
21.05.2009 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 8
21.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
21.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.05.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
11.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.03.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.03.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.03.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.02.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.07.2005 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.05.2005 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
13.04.2005 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
17.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.03.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.03.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.03.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.03.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.03.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.03.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.03.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.03.2005 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.12.2004 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
24.11.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.11.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.11.2004 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
20.10.2004 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.08.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
26.07.2004 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.07.2004 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.07.2004 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
12.11.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.11.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.10.2003 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 14
17.10.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.10.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
04.03.2003 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
21.01.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.01.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 1
21.01.2003 Description International Searching Authority 9
21.01.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 2