Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1455686

EP1455686 - A SUPPORT FRAME FOR AN EMBOLIC PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2012
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2012  [2012/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salviac Limited
39-40 Upper Mount Street
Dublin 2 / IE
[2004/38]
Inventor(s)01 / BRADY, Eamon
12 Karol Avenue
Elphin, County Roscommon / IE
02 / VALE, David
26 The Stiles Road, Clontarf
Dublin 3 / IE
03 / KELLY, Ronald
Cannistown, The Pigeons
Athlone, County Westmeath / IE
04 / NEILAN, John
Shanaglish
Gort, County Galway / IE
05 / HORAN, Steven
Carrick, The Pigeons
Athlone, CountyWestmeath / IE
06 / RABITTE, Gerard
The Bridge, Ballyglunin
Tuam, Co. Galway / IE
07 / MCCAFFREY, Gerry
Drumna, Roslea
County Fermanagh, Northern Ireland / GB
 [2004/38]
Representative(s)Roche, Dermot , et al
John A, O'Brien & Associates
Third Floor
Duncairn House
14 Carysfort Avenue
Blackrock, County Dublin / IE
[N/P]
Former [2004/38]Roche, Dermot , et al
John A, O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Caryfort Avenue
Blackrock, County Dublin / IE
Application number, filing date02785870.323.12.2002
[2004/38]
WO2002IE00174
Priority number, dateUS20010341836P21.12.2001         Original published format: US 341836 P
US20010341805P21.12.2001         Original published format: US 341805 P
US20020373640P19.04.2002         Original published format: US 373640 P
US20020373641P19.04.2002         Original published format: US 373641 P
US20020377248P03.05.2002         Original published format: US 377248 P
[2004/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03055412
Date:10.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1455686
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003
[2004/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2004/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:STÜTZRAHMEN FÜR EINE EMBOLIESCHUTZVORRICHTUNG[2004/38]
English:A SUPPORT FRAME FOR AN EMBOLIC PROTECTION DEVICE[2004/38]
French:CADRE DE SUPPORT POUR DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES EMBOLIES[2004/38]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2004National basic fee paid 
08.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
28.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/24]
24.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.08.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
06.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inExamination US6129739
  WO0132254
  EP0472368
by applicantWO0197714
 US42627
 WO9923976
 WO0180776
 WO0180773