Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1452865

EP1452865 - COMPOSITION FOR BLOOD SERUM OR PLASMA SEPARATION AND VESSEL FOR BLOOD EXAMINATION CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
4-4, Nishitenma 2-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8565 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
4-4, Nishitenma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8565 / JP
Former [2004/36]For all designated states
SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.
4-4, Nishitenma 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ANRAKU, Hideo
Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4560, Kaisei-cho
Shunan-city, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP
02 / OKAMOTO, Ryusuke
Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4560, Kaisei-cho
Shunan-city, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP
 [2009/08]
Former [2004/36]01 / ANRAKU, Hideo
Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP
02 / OKAMOTO, Ryusuke
Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4560, Kaisei-cho
Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/36]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02786010.503.12.2002
[2004/36]
WO2002JP12623
Priority number, dateJP2001037033604.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001370336
[2004/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03048764
Date:12.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1452865
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003
[2004/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1452865
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.06.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/48
[2004/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/36]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR TRENNUNG VON BLUTSERUM ODER -PLASMA UND DIESE ENTHALTENDES GEFÄSS ZUR BLUTUNTERSUCHUNG[2004/36]
English:COMPOSITION FOR BLOOD SERUM OR PLASMA SEPARATION AND VESSEL FOR BLOOD EXAMINATION CONTAINING THE SAME[2004/36]
French:COMPOSITION DE SEPARATION DU SERUM OU DU PLASMA SANGUIN ET CONTENANT RENFERMANT LADITE COMPOSITION, UTILISES POUR L'EXAMEN DU SANG[2004/36]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2004Translation filed 
02.02.2004National basic fee paid 
02.02.2004Search fee paid 
02.02.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
21.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
23.04.2008Fee for grant paid
23.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
23.04.2008Request for further processing filed
23.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.05.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2010/48]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/08]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/50]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/49]CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/38]FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/34]ES29.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0566794  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * in particular:; page 3, line 36 - line 37 * * page 3, line 46 - line 48 * * page 4, line 19 - line 21 * * page 7, line 4 - line 5 * * page 7, line 44 - line 50 * * tables B-1,B-2,B-3 * * page 12, line 19 - line 21 *;
 [A]US5454958  (FIEHLER WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * * in particular:; column 5, line 16 - line 18 *;
 [A]JPH04337458  (TORAY RES CENTER KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4180465  (MURTY VABILISETTI S [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * * in particular:; column 3, line 45 - line 46 *
International search[A]JPH063356  (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0915238  (TOONETSUKUSU KK, et al)