Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1508878

EP1508878 - TOLL ROAD CHARGE COLLECTION SYSTEM USING ARTIFICIAL SATELLITE, CHARGE COLLECTING MACHINE, AND CHARGE COLLECTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/08]TOLL ROAD CHARGE COLLECTION SYSTEM USING ARTIFICIAL SATELLITE, CHARGE COLLECTING MACHINE, AND CHARGE COLLECTING METHOD
[2005/14]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.09.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.10.2009  [2009/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takida, Yoshiaki
6-905, Urban-rafle Obata, 1-8, Obata Ota, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi 463-0051 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/08]For all designated states
Takida, Yoshiaki
6-905, Urban-rafle Obata, 1-8, Obata Ota, Moriyama-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 463-0051 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/08]
Representative(s)Vetter, Hans
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/08]Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys.Dr.
Patentanwälte, Magenbauer & Kollegen, Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date02788589.625.10.2002
[2005/08]
WO2002JP11103
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004038663
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1508878
Date:23.02.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004
[2005/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.05.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/00, G06F17/60, B60S5/00, B60S1/08
[2005/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2005/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRASSENGEBÜHRENSAMMELSYSTEM MIT EINEM KÜNSTLICHEN SATELLITEN, GEBÜHRENSAMMELMASCHINE UND GEBÜHRENSAMMELVERFAHREN[2005/08]
English:TOLL ROAD CHARGE COLLECTION SYSTEM USING ARTIFICIAL SATELLITE, CHARGE COLLECTING MACHINE, AND CHARGE COLLECTING METHOD[2005/14]
French:SYSTEME DE COLLECTE DE DROITS DE PEAGE UTILISANT UN SATELLITE ARTIFICIEL, APPAREIL DE COLLECTE DE DROITS ET PROCEDE DE COLLECTE DE CES DROITS[2005/08]
Former [2005/08]TOLL ROAD CHARGE COLLECTION SYSTEM USING ARTIFICIAL SATELLITE, CHARGE COLLECTING MACHINE, AND CHARGE COLLECTING METHOD
Entry into regional phase19.08.2004Translation filed 
18.08.2004National basic fee paid 
18.08.2004Search fee paid 
09.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
19.08.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
11.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/43]
05.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/43]
Divisional application(s)EP04023983.2  / EP1548652
Request for further processing for:02.09.2005Request for further processing filed
02.09.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.09.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5490079  (SHARPE ET AL) [X] 1,2,15-17 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 9; figures 2,3; claims 1-13 * [A] 3-14;
 [XA]JPH11238153
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11238153 A 19990831 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP; AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [X] 1,16,17 * abstract * [A] 2-15
International search[Y]EP1050853  ;
 [Y]JPH1040430  ;
 [Y]JP2002228478  ;
 [Y]JPH06102148  ;
 [Y]JP2001165818  ;
 [Y]JP2002202003  ;
 [Y]JPH1024682  ;
 [Y]JPH023559  ;
 [Y]JPH1040428  ;
 [Y]JP2002222361  ;
 [Y]JP2001307276  ;
 [Y]JP2001174282  ;
 [Y]JP2001153969  ;
 [Y]JPH11272986  ;
 [Y]JP2001180239  ;
 [Y]JPH10236226