Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1483378

EP1483378 - RECYCLING SYSTEM FOR MANIPULATION OF INTRACELLULAR NADH AVAILABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rice University
6100 Main Street
Houston, TX 77005 / US
[2013/08]
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Rice University
6100 Main Street
Houston, TX 77020 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAN, Ka-Yiu
2923 Plumb Street
Houston, TX 77005 / US
02 / BERRIOS-RIVERA, Susana, J.
4005 Fernwood Dr.
Pearland, TX 77584 / US
03 / BENNETT, George, N.
5006 Braesvalley
Houston, TX 77096 / US
 [2004/50]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Atkinson, Jennifer , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Former [2009/49]Atkinson, Jennifer , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [2004/50]Baldock, Sharon Claire , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date02789374.201.11.2002
[2004/50]
WO2002US35143
Priority number, dateUS20010335371P02.11.2001         Original published format: US 335371 P
[2004/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03040690
Date:15.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1483378
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003
[2004/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1483378
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.10.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/04, C07H21/04, C12Q1/00, C12P7/00
[2004/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/50]
Extension statesAL28.05.2004
LT28.05.2004
LV28.05.2004
MK28.05.2004
RO28.05.2004
SI28.05.2004
TitleGerman:RECYCLING-SYSTEM ZUR MANIPULATION INTRAZELLULÄRER NADH-VERFÜGBARKEIT[2004/50]
English:RECYCLING SYSTEM FOR MANIPULATION OF INTRACELLULAR NADH AVAILABILITY[2004/50]
French:SYSTEME DE RECYCLAGE PERMETTANT LA MANIPULATION DE LA DISPONIBILITE INTRACELLULAIRE DU NADH[2004/50]
Entry into regional phase28.05.2004National basic fee paid 
28.05.2004Search fee paid 
28.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/50]
30.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2012Fee for grant paid
25.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.09.2013  08.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. H. Ulrich Dörries
Fünf Höfe, Theatinerstr. 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2015/40]
Former [2013/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.09.2013   
Dr. H. Ulrich Dörries
Fünf Höfe, Theatinerstr. 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
11.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0090/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE01.11.2013
LU01.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE01.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE01.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
Former [2013/36]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
Former [2013/35]BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
Former [2013/34]SE02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - SLUSARCZYK H ET AL, "Stabilization of NAD-dependent formate dehydrogenase from Candida boidinii by site-directed mutagenesis of cysteine residues", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, (200003), vol. 267, no. 5, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 1280 - 1289, XP002192089 [X] 9-16 * the whole document * [Y] 1-31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01123.x
 [Y]  - LOPEZ DE FELIPE F ET AL, "Cofactor engineering: a novel approach to metabolic engineering in Lactococcus lactis by controlled expression of NADH oxidase", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199808), vol. 180, no. 15, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 3804 - 3808, XP002128387 [Y] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - BERRÍOS-RIVERA SUSANA J ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of Escherichia coli: increase of NADH availability by overexpressing an NAD(+)-dependent formate dehydrogenase.", METABOLIC ENGINEERING. JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 217 - 229, XP002362652 [PX] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mben.2002.0227
 [PX]  - BERRÍOS-RIVERA SUSANA J ET AL, "The effect of increasing NADH availability on the redistribution of metabolic fluxes in Escherichia coli chemostat cultures.", METABOLIC ENGINEERING. JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 230 - 237, XP002362653 [PX] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mben.2002.0228
 [T]  - TISHKOV V I ET AL, "Catalytic mechanism and application of formate dehydrogenase.", BIOCHEMISTRY. BIOKHIMIIA. NOV 2004, (200411), vol. 69, no. 11, ISSN 0006-2979, pages 1252 - 1267, XP002362654 [T] 1-31 * page 1261, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 1262, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10541-005-0071-x
International search[X]US6001590