Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1485317

EP1485317 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR FORMING MICROPROJECTION ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
1010 Joaquin Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2008/40]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Alza Corporation
1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210, Building M10-3
Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TRAUTMAN, Joseph, C.
1574 Wright Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / TRAUTMAN, Cedric, T.
795 Hilmar Street
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
03 / KEENAN, Richard, L.
14711 Fruitvale Avenue
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
04 / CHAN, Keith, T.
1235 Balboa Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Soames, Candida Jane , et al
EAPD Innovations 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton
SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2004/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date02789940.027.11.2002
[2004/51]
WO2002US38270
Priority number, dateUS20010336083P30.11.2001         Original published format: US 336083 P
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03048031
Date:12.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1485317
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003
[2004/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:B81B1/00, B81C1/00, A61M37/00
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIKROPROJEKTORANORDNUNGEN[2004/51]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR FORMING MICROPROJECTION ARRAYS[2004/51]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREILS DE FORMATION DE GRILLES DE MICROPROJECTIONS[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2004National basic fee paid 
08.10.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
19.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/47]
07.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.10.2004AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004BG   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004CY   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004CZ   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004DK   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004EE   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004FI   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004IE   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004MC   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004PT   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004SK   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
08.10.2004TR   M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.10.2004M01   Fee paid on   08.10.2004
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]US3072122  (ROY ROSENTHAL SOL) [X] 21,22 * The entire document and in particular *;; figures 7-12 * * column 4, line 41 - line 55 * [A] 1-33;
 [XA]WO9748440  (ALZA CORP) [X] 25 * The entire document and in particular *;; figures 2-21,29 * * page 6, line 12 - page 15, line 6 * [A] 1-33;
 [XA]US6230051  (NEUKERMANS ARMAND P ET AL) [X] 25 * figures 1-4 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 29 * [A] 1-33