Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1450630

EP1450630 - ADJUSTABLE ALIGNER CUP ASSEMBLY FOR PEACH PITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATLAS PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O. Box 500 Pueblo
Colorado 81002 / US
[2009/08]
Former [2004/36]For all designated states
ATLAS PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O. Box 500
Pueblo, Colorado 81002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WRIGHT, William, R.
1164 Oakleaf Drive
Pueblo West, CO 81007 / US
02 / LAYDON, David, R., Jr.
1519 North Ogden Avenue
Pueblo, CO 81001 / US
03 / ROOF, Barry, Spencer
24 Bellflower Court
Pueblo, CO 81001 / US
 [2004/36]
Representative(s)Clegg, Richard Ian
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/36]Clegg, Richard Ian
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02789944.227.11.2002
[2004/36]
WO2002US38277
Priority number, dateUS20010336797P03.12.2001         Original published format: US 336797 P
US20020401022P02.08.2002         Original published format: US 401022 P
[2004/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03047369
Date:12.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1450630
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003
[2004/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1450630
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:A23N4/04
[2004/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLBARE AUSRICHTUNGSPFANNE FÜR EINEN PFIRSICHENTSTEINER[2004/36]
English:ADJUSTABLE ALIGNER CUP ASSEMBLY FOR PEACH PITTER[2004/36]
French:ENSEMBLE DE GODETS DE DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT REGLABLES PERMETTANT DE DENOYAUTER DES PECHES[2004/36]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2004National basic fee paid 
22.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
23.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2008Fee for grant paid
23.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2010/08]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/50]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/49]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Former [2009/43]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Former [2009/38]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL18.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US3695322  (ANDERSON GERALD R, et al) [A] 1,15,17 * column 4, line 66 - column 7, line 35; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]US3179232  (RODRIGUES ANTHONY F) [A] 1,15,17 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 2; figures 2-6 *;
 [A]US3780641  (HOLE W);
 [A]US2969867  (MCCLELLAND ETHERIDGE R)
by applicantUS4054675
 US4288461
 US4380953
 US4486454
 US5182983
 US4730719
 US4726898
 US5413206
 US5855270