Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1459268

EP1459268 - VALUABLE DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[2018/03]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PLASCHKA, Reinhard
Lindenstrasse 6
86949 Windach / DE
02 / MÜLLER, Johann
Zugspitzstrasse 17
85586 Poing / DE
03 / ADAMCZYK, Roger
Sperberstrasse 2
81827 München / DE
04 / FRANZ, Peter
Tannenweg 15
85567 Bruck / DE
 [2004/39]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2005/14]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date02790486.112.12.2002
[2004/39]
WO2002EP14161
Priority number, dateDE2001106205017.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10162050
[2004/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03052702
Date:26.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1459268
Date:22.09.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003
[2004/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1459268
Date:20.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/08]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1459268
Date:03.09.2014
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:G07D7/12, B42D15/00
[2004/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/39]
Extension statesAL19.07.2004
LT19.07.2004
LV19.07.2004
MK19.07.2004
RO19.07.2004
TitleGerman:WERTDOKUMENT[2004/39]
English:VALUABLE DOCUMENT[2004/39]
French:DOCUMENT DE VALEUR[2004/39]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2004National basic fee paid 
19.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/39]
19.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
12.03.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2012Fee for grant paid
13.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.11.2004
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013  14.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Gulde & Partner, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
 02  19.11.2013  22.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
KBA-NotaSys SA
Avenue du Grey 55 Case Postale 347
1000 Lausanne 22 / CH
Opponent's representative
Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND SA
Chemin des Charmettes 9
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013  14.06.2013  WITHDRAWN
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider, et al
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
 02  19.11.2013  22.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
KBA-NotaSys SA
Avenue du Grey 55 Case Postale 347
1000 Lausanne 22 / CH
Opponent's representative
Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND SA
Chemin des Charmettes 9
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
Former [2013/52]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013  14.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider, et al
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
 02  19.11.2013   
KBA-NotaSys SA
Avenue du Grey 55 Case Postale 347
1000 Lausanne 22 / CH
Opponent's representative
Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND SA
Chemin des Charmettes 9
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider, et al
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
14.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
10.09.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
05.11.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition07.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0822/16
14.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0822/16
07.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.05.2008Appeal received No.  T1317/08
27.06.2008Statement of grounds filed
15.05.2012Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
01.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
29.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT12.12.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
TR12.12.2015
GB12.12.2016
NL01.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2018/01]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT12.12.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
TR12.12.2015
GB12.12.2016
Former [2017/46]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT12.12.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
TR12.12.2015
Former [2015/25]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
AT12.12.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
IE12.12.2013
LU12.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
LU12.12.2013
BE31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
MC20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
LU12.12.2013
Former [2014/03]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/52]CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/48]DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/40]FI20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
Former [2013/36]BG20.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
Former [2013/34]BG20.05.2013
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9748555  (KAULE WITTICH ;MAYER KARLHEINZ (DE); GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH (DE)) [DX] 1-11,13-19 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 23 * * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, line 21 - line 25 * * page 13, line 9 - line 14 * * page 14, line 1 - line 11 * * figure - *;
 [X]DE19845440  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH) [X] 1-7,12-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, line 36 - line 40 * * column 4, line 6 - line 39 * * column 5, line 5 - line 19 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 45 * * figure - *;
 [X]DE19845436  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH) [X] 1-7,12-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 53 * * column 3, line 17 - line 21 * * column 4, line 14 - line 22 * * figure - *;
 [X]WO0172525  (BALDUS CHRISTOF ;DANIEL FRANZ (DE); PREIDT ADOLF (DE); REBELE THEO) [X] 1-7,14-19 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 18 - line 29 * * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * * page 9, line 10 - line 26 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 16 * * page 12, line 6 - line 14 * * figures 1-5 *