Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1453966

EP1453966 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A RECOMBINANT POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sandoz AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2009/08]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
SANDOZ AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
SANDOZ GMBH
Biochemiestrasse 10
6250 Kundl / AT
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÖRGENDORFER, Kurt
Niederbreitenbach 172
A-6322 Langkampfen / AT
02 / WINDISCH, Jörg
Länd 192z
A-6233 Kramsach / AT
03 / KUNERT, Renate
Galileigasse 5
A-2232 Deutsch-Wagram / AT
04 / UNTERLUGGAUER, Florian
Prof. Sinwelweg 2/5
A-6330 Kufstein / AT
 [2004/37]
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2013/44]
Former [2008/36](deleted)
...
Former [2005/12]de Weerd, Petrus G.W. , et al
Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2004/37]Grubb, Philip William
Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date02791720.226.11.2002
[2004/37]
WO2002EP13297
Priority number, dateUS20010333868P28.11.2001         Original published format: US 333868 P
[2004/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03046187
Date:05.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1453966
Date:08.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003
[2004/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1453966
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/02, C12N15/85, C07K14/505, C12N15/90
[2012/01]
Former International [2004/37]C12N15/85, C07K14/505, C12N15/90
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/37]
Extension statesLT28.06.2004
LV28.06.2004
RO28.06.2004
SI28.06.2004
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REKOMBINANTEN PEPTIDEN[2015/20]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A RECOMBINANT POLYPEPTIDE[2004/37]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN POLYPEPTIDE RECOMBINANT[2004/37]
Former [2004/37]METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REKOMBINANTEN POLYPEPTIDEN
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase28.06.2004National basic fee paid 
28.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.05.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/37]
22.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2012Fee for grant paid
24.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.04.2013  12.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
 02  11.04.2013  17.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP, et al
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 [2019/04]
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2013  12.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
 02  11.04.2013  17.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2013  12.01.2015  WITHDRAWN
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
 02  11.04.2013  17.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2013/20]
Opponent(s)01  10.04.2013   
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG/ Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Corporate Patents
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
 02  11.04.2013   
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
21.05.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.12.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1904/15
16.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.01.2010Request for further processing filed
12.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.01.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
CZ11.07.2012
DK11.07.2012
EE11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
NL11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
SK11.07.2012
TR11.07.2012
BG11.10.2012
GR12.10.2012
ES22.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
IE26.11.2012
LU26.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
CZ11.07.2012
DK11.07.2012
EE11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
NL11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
SK11.07.2012
TR11.07.2012
BG11.10.2012
GR12.10.2012
ES22.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
IE26.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2013/47]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
CZ11.07.2012
DK11.07.2012
EE11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
NL11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
SK11.07.2012
BG11.10.2012
GR12.10.2012
ES22.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
IE26.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/34]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
CZ11.07.2012
DK11.07.2012
EE11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
NL11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
SK11.07.2012
BG11.10.2012
GR12.10.2012
ES22.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/33]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
CZ11.07.2012
DK11.07.2012
EE11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
NL11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
SK11.07.2012
GR12.10.2012
ES22.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/15]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
NL11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
GR12.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
Former [2013/13]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
GR12.10.2012
PT12.11.2012
Former [2013/12]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
SE11.07.2012
GR12.10.2012
Former [2013/11]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
GR12.10.2012
Former [2013/10]BE11.07.2012
CY11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
Former [2013/09]BE11.07.2012
FI11.07.2012
Former [2013/08]BE11.07.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4965199  (LEVINSON ARTHUR D ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13,15,16,18,19,21,29,31,32 * see abstract, column 5 lines 34-53, column 17, items G and H. * [Y] 4,8-10,14,17,20,22-28,30;
 [Y]WO9635718  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH ;BURG JOSEF (DE); SCHNEIDER WALTER (DE);) [Y] 4,8-10,14,17,20,22-28,30 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0319206  (CODON CORP) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13,15,16,18,19,21,29,31,32 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8-10,14,17,20,22-28,30
 [X]  - YOON SUNG KWAN ET AL, "Influence of reducing agents on the secretion rate of recombinant erythropoietin from CHO cells.", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (199802), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 101 - 104, XP009007462 [X] 1-32 * page 101, column 2, last paragraph; page 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005303802776