Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1468844

EP1468844 - PNEUMATIC RADIAL TIRE FOR CONSTRUCTION VEHICLE, BELT LAYER OF THE RADIAL TIRE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE RADIAL TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.08.2010  [2010/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIDA, Chihiro c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2004/43]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/43]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date02792012.326.12.2002
[2004/43]
WO2002JP13633
Priority number, dateJP2001039595527.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001395955
[2004/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03055697
Date:10.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1468844
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003
[2004/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.07.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/20, B60C9/18, B29D30/38
[2004/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/43]
TitleGerman:"RADIALLUFTREIFEN FÜR BAUFAHRZEUG, GÜRTELLAGE FÜR RADIALREIFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES RADIALREIFENS"[2004/43]
English:PNEUMATIC RADIAL TIRE FOR CONSTRUCTION VEHICLE, BELT LAYER OF THE RADIAL TIRE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE RADIAL TIRE[2004/43]
French:PNEU A CARCASSE RADIALE POUR VEHICULE DE CONSTRUCTION, COUCHE CEINTURE DU PNEU ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DU PNEU[2004/43]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2004Translation filed 
28.06.2004National basic fee paid 
28.06.2004Search fee paid 
28.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/43]
28.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/31]
18.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0148306  (FUJI SEIKO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-38 *;
 []EP1172476  (FUJI SEIKO CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0094]; figures 7-16 *;
 [X]EP0619170  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 6; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0478258  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 1 - line 4 * * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 22 - line 53; figure 9 *;
 [X]JPS58193134  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [X]JPS56128384  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-10 *;
 JPS56128384  [ ]
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, Database accession no. 168851, & JPS56128384 A 19811007 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [ ] * abstract *
International search[Y]EP0698509  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]);
 [Y]JPH06262906  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [Y]JPH0495506  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [Y]JPH079813  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD);
 [A]JPS5670304U  ;
 [AE]JP2002225507  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [AE]JP2002301906  (BRIDGESTONE CORP)