Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1460914

EP1460914 - AN ADJUSTABLE CONSTRUCTION PREFERABLY AN ARTICLE OF FURNITURE AND A SQUEEZE PROTECTION AND A DRIVE UNIT THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linak A/S
Smedevænget 8 Guderup
6430 Nordborg / DK
[2017/10]
Former [2008/09]For all designated states
LINAK A/S
Smedevaenget 8, Guderup
DK-6430 Nordborg / DK
Former [2004/40]For all designated states
LINAK A/S
Smedevaenget 8, Guderup
DK-6430 Nordborg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Bastholm, Jeppe
Bækgade 3, Blans
DK-6400 Sønderborg / DK
 [2008/09]
Former [2004/40]01 / Bastholm, Jeppe
Baekgade 3, Blans
DK-6400 Sonderborg / DK
Representative(s)Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Friedrichstraße 2-6
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/47](deleted)
...
Former [2010/25]Knoblauch, Andreas
Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2004/40]Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard
Linak A/S Patent Department P.O. Box 238
9100 Aalborg / DK
Application number, filing date02792704.513.12.2002
[2004/40]
WO2002DK00855
Priority number, dateDK2001000187113.12.2001         Original published format: DK 200101871
[2004/40]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03056976
Date:17.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1460914
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003
[2004/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1460914
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47B9/20
[2004/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLBARE KONSTRUKTION, VORZUGSWEISE EIN MÖBELSTÜCK, SOWIE EIN QUETSCHSCHUTZ UND EINE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT DAFÜR[2004/40]
English:AN ADJUSTABLE CONSTRUCTION PREFERABLY AN ARTICLE OF FURNITURE AND A SQUEEZE PROTECTION AND A DRIVE UNIT THERETO[2004/40]
French:STRUCTURE REGLABLE, DE PREFERENCE UN ARTICLE DE MOBILIER, PROTECTION CONTRE LE COINCEMENT, ET ORGANE DE COMMANDE ASSOCIE[2004/40]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2003Translation filed 
22.06.2004National basic fee paid 
22.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/40]
20.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2008Fee for grant paid
09.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.11.2008  03.12.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Logicdata Electronic&Software Entwicklungs GmbH
Wirtschaftspark 18
8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer, et al
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Postfach 20 07 34
80007 München / DE
 [2015/34]
Former [2009/02]
Opponent(s)01  26.11.2008  03.12.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Logicdata Electronic&Software Entwicklungs GmbH
Wirtschaftspark 18
8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT
Opponent's representative
Epping, Wilhelm, et al
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
09.01.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
11.07.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition22.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1951/17
20.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
12.09.2011Appeal received No.  T2057/11
21.11.2011Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
09.09.2011Appeal received No.  T2057/11
20.03.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2015/12]
15.01.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
15.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:24.07.2007Request for further processing filed
24.07.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.08.2007Decision despatched
05.10.2006Request for further processing filed
05.10.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.10.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200403   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GB13.12.2015
IT13.12.2015
ES14.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NL01.01.2016
[2017/20]
Former [2017/04]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GB13.12.2015
IT13.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NL01.01.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GB13.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
NL01.01.2016
Former [2016/49]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GB13.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
NL01.01.2016
Former [2016/47]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
GB13.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
BE31.12.2015
Former [2010/48]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/37]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
TR27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2010/32]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
LU13.12.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/47]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
IE15.12.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/34]AT27.02.2008
CY27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
MC31.12.2008
Former [2009/23]AT27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
BG27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/22]AT27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
EE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/49]AT27.02.2008
CZ27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
SK27.02.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/44]AT27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SI27.02.2008
Former [2008/39]AT27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
Cited inInternational search[Y]SE516479  ;
 [Y]US3830103  ;
 [Y]DE19957187  ;
 [Y]NL7908078