Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1563419

EP1563419 - METHOD FOR PREDICTING THE FORMATION OF MOULD FUNGI [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2009
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SEDLBAUER, Klaus
Wallbergstrasse 6
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
02 / KRUS, Martin
Pennstrasse 44
81549 München / DE
 [2005/33]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/33]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date02794505.417.07.2002
[2005/33]
WO2002EP07951
Priority number, dateDE2001103788902.08.2001         Original published format: DE 10137889
[2005/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03014986
Date:20.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1563419
Date:17.08.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003
[2005/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2005/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2005/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON SCHIMMELPILZBILDUNG[2005/33]
English:METHOD FOR PREDICTING THE FORMATION OF MOULD FUNGI[2005/33]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PREVOIR LE DEVELOPPEMENT DE MOISISSURES[2005/33]
Entry into regional phase07.11.2002National basic fee paid 
29.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2002Examination requested  [2005/33]
16.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.12.2013Appeal received No.  T0547/14
18.02.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 18