blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1458575 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1458575



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1946
17.01.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.01.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.01.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
21.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.12.2018 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
21.12.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 2
21.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.09.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 5
11.09.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 5
11.09.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 5
11.09.2018 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 17
31.08.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 5
01.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.07.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 53
12.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 3
04.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.06.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
30.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 8
30.01.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.01.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.01.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
30.01.2018 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
08.01.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
21.12.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
21.12.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
19.12.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
07.12.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 9
10.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.11.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 6
08.11.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
07.11.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
06.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.11.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
23.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
04.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
28.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
01.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.02.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.02.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
03.02.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
03.02.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
25.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.01.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
19.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2017 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
17.01.2017 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 2
17.01.2017 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 3
16.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.12.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
16.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.12.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 24
06.12.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
25.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
13.05.2016 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 3
01.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.04.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
03.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
05.12.2013 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
16.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
14.10.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
14.10.2013 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
11.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
07.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.10.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
07.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
07.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
07.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
01.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
24.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.09.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.09.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
12.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.09.2013 F3047 Inadmissibility of the appeal: diverse Appeal 1
06.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
07.08.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.06.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.06.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
17.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
29.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.05.2013 Annex Appeal 37
29.05.2013 Annex Appeal 36
29.05.2013 Annex Appeal 12
29.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
29.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
29.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
03.04.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
27.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
26.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
26.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
07.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
08.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
31.01.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
31.01.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
31.01.2013 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 21
15.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
13.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
12.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 77
07.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
07.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
09.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
09.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
09.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
09.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
09.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
09.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
09.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
09.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
29.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
29.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
26.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
08.03.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
09.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
09.02.2012 Claims Opposition 5
09.02.2012 Claims Opposition 6
09.02.2012 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
19.01.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
10.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.01.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
03.01.2012 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
22.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 8
15.01.2010 Claims Opposition 5
15.01.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
24.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.11.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.08.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.08.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
05.08.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
09.07.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.07.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Opposition 2
01.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.07.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
01.07.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
01.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
29.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.06.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.06.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
25.06.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
25.06.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.06.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
16.12.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.12.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.08.2008 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
14.08.2008 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
14.08.2008 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
13.08.2008 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
28.07.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.07.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
28.07.2008 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 3
21.05.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 2
30.11.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.11.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
20.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
20.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
20.06.2007 Description Search / examination 20
20.06.2007 Description Search / examination 20
20.06.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
15.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
15.06.2007 Description Search / examination 20
15.06.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.02.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.08.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.08.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.08.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.06.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
18.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
18.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
10.05.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
22.04.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.04.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.04.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.04.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.04.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.04.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.04.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.04.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.02.2004 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
26.02.2004 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.12.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.12.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.12.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
29.07.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.07.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.07.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.07.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.07.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.07.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
03.07.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
15.05.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 5
28.01.2003 Description International Searching Authority 20
28.01.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 6