Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1461748

EP1461748 - PAIR TRADING SYSTEM AND METHOD CROSS-REFERENCE TO RELATED APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.03.2011  [2011/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Morgan Stanley
1585 Broadway
New York, NY 10036 / US
[2004/40]
Inventor(s)01 / WADDELL, William, Matthew
271 Midland Avenue
Rye, NY 10580 / US
 [2004/40]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/40]Cabinet Hirsch
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02795678.826.11.2002
[2004/40]
WO2002US37922
Priority number, dateUS20010334163P29.11.2001         Original published format: US 334163 P
[2004/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03063040
Date:31.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1461748
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003
[2004/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.07.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2004/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PAIR-TRADING-SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN QUERVERWEIS AUF VERWANDTE ANMELDUNG[2004/40]
English:PAIR TRADING SYSTEM AND METHOD CROSS-REFERENCE TO RELATED APPLICATION[2004/40]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PAIR TRADING[2004/40]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2004National basic fee paid 
29.06.2004Search fee paid 
29.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/40]
30.08.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/09]
08.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200807   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2008
30.11.201009   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[A]US5857176  (GINSBERG PHILIP MYRON [US]);
 [A]US5243331  (MCCAUSLAND ROBERT G [US], et al);
 [A]US5774880  (GINSBERG PHILIP MYRON [US])