blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1456451 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1456451



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 735
13.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.06.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 12
29.06.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
29.06.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
29.06.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
11.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
02.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
02.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.04.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.03.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.03.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
09.03.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.03.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
04.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
28.09.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
27.07.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.07.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
13.04.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.04.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
06.04.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 52
06.04.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 66
06.04.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 28
06.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
16.01.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
05.01.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.01.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.01.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.01.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
15.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
28.11.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
28.11.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
28.11.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.11.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
07.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.04.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.04.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
15.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
15.04.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.04.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.03.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
30.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.08.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.08.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
23.07.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.07.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.07.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
19.07.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
19.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
19.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
19.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
19.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
19.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
24.09.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.09.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.09.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.09.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.05.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.05.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
05.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
29.04.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
14.06.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
11.06.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
10.04.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
10.10.2005 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
26.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
26.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.07.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.04.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.02.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.09.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
23.07.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
10.05.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
31.12.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
06.11.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.11.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.11.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.10.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.10.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.10.2003 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.09.2003 Notification of defects in the demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
11.07.2003 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.07.2003 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
11.07.2003 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.07.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
03.07.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
27.05.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.05.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2003 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.02.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
07.02.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 3
07.02.2003 Description International Searching Authority 16