Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1427299

EP1427299 - DEVICE FOR COMBINING GROUPS OF FILTER SEGMENTS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-SEGMENT FILTERS OF THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY, AND TROUGH DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32
21033 Hamburg / DE
[2004/25]
Inventor(s)01 / HORN, Sönke
Illenweg 54
21502 Geesthacht / DE
02 / SCHERBARTH, Thorsten
Westerkamp 43
21502 Geesthacht / DE
03 / WOLFF, Stephan
Eichloh 3
21509 Glinde / DE
04 / STROHECKER, Gerd
Elbuferstrasse 195
21436 Marschacht / DE
05 / ROCKTÄSCHEL, Steffen
Helene-Lange-Strasse 73
21337 Lüneburg / DE
06 / STEINIGER, Wolfgang
Grünhofer Strasse 23b
21502 Geesthacht / DE
07 / LORENZEN, Heinz-Christen
Blautannenweg 24a
21465 Wentorf / DE
08 / HEITMANN, Uwe
Schärstrasse 3
21031 Hamburg / DE
09 / GEORGITSIS, Nikolaos
Dünenweg 14
21033 Hamburg / DE
 [2004/25]
Representative(s)Seemann, Ralph , et al
Patentanwälte
Seemann & Partner
Raboisen 6
20095 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]Seemann, Ralph , et al
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/28]Seemann, Ralph , et al
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2004/25]Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date02798702.331.08.2002
[2004/25]
WO2002EP09746
Priority number, dateDE200114601918.09.2001         Original published format: DE 10146019
DE200115529202.11.2001         Original published format: DE 10155292
[2004/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03024256
Date:27.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1427299
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003
[2004/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1427299
Date:04.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/40]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1427299
Date:25.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/47
[2004/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/25]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUM ZUSAMMENSTELLEN VON GRUPPEN VON FILTERSEGMENTEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MULTISEGMENTFILTERN DER TABAKVERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE UND MULDENTROMMEL[2004/25]
English:DEVICE FOR COMBINING GROUPS OF FILTER SEGMENTS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-SEGMENT FILTERS OF THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY, AND TROUGH DRUM[2004/25]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE DE GROUPES DE SEGMENTS DE FILTRE POUR PRODUIRE DES FILTRES MULTISEGMENTS DE L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC ET TAMBOUR A AUGES[2004/25]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2004National basic fee paid 
05.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
26.01.2005Observations by third parties
03.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2006Fee for grant paid
11.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.01.2007  19.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
G.D S.p.A.
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
Opponent's representative
Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria, et al
c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
 [2011/42]
Former [2009/39]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2007  19.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
G.D Societa' per Azioni
Via Battindarno 91
40133 Bologna / IT
Opponent's representative
Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria, et al
c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Former [2009/25]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2007  19.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
G.D Societa' per Azioni
Via Battindarno 91
40133 Bologna / IT
Opponent's representative
Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria, et al
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Former [2007/07]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2007   
G.D Societa' per Azioni
Via Battindarno 91
40133 Bologna / IT
Opponent's representative
Maccagnan, Matteo, et al
Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti 9
I-10121 Torino / IT
08.08.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.12.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.01.2009Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.09.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.09.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.04.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.06.2012Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.05.2009Appeal received No.  T1033/09
22.07.2009Statement of grounds filed
20.09.2011Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
20.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.10.2006
CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
TR04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
AT31.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
LU31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
FR31.08.2009
ES01.09.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2010/35]CY04.10.2006
CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
TR04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
AT31.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
LU31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
FR31.08.2009
Former [2009/42]CY04.10.2006
CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
TR04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
AT31.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
LU31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/38]CY04.10.2006
CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
AT31.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
LU31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/50]CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
AT31.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/40]CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
BE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/38]CZ04.10.2006
EE04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/22]CZ04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/04]CZ04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/46]CZ04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
SK04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/42]CZ04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IE04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/39]CZ04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/27]FI04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI04.10.2006
BG04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]US3368460  (BERNHARD SCHUBERT) [X] 1-5,7,8,16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5558103  (GARTHAFFNER MARTIN T ET AL) [X] 1-8,16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4036119  (SCHUBERT BERNHARD ET AL) [X] 1-8,16 * figure 11 *;
 [DX]DE2520026  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [DX] 1-3,16 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US3357320  (HAGAN MICHAEL B ET AL) [X] 1-3,9,16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]GB1264483  (MOLINS MACHINE COMPANY LTD) [X] 1-3,16 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5984851  (IRIKURA TAKAYUKI) [X] 17-21 * figures 8,9 *;
 [A]CH531316  (TABAC FAB REUNIES SA) [A] 17 * figure 1 *
otherUS4010678
 EP0645307
OppositionEP1226765
 EP0383970
 US4237778
 EP1016350