blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1429949

EP1429949 - CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR A COUPLING ELEMENT OF A PNEUMATIC COUPLING FOR USE IN TRAIN COUPLINGS, ESPECIALLY AUTOMATIC TRAIN COUPLINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MÜNZENHOFER, Franz
Eigenheimstr. 36a
85764 Oberschlei heim / DE
02 / KNOSS, Rainer
Hedwig-Dransfeld-Allee 40
80637 München / DE
 [2004/38]
Former [2004/26]01 / MÜNZENHOFER, Franz
Eigenheimstr. 36a
85764 Oberschlei heim / DE
02 / KNOSS, Rainer
Hedwig-Dransfeld-Allee 38
80637 München / DE
Application number, filing date02798714.811.09.2002
[2004/26]
WO2002EP10182
Priority number, dateDE200114573717.09.2001         Original published format: DE 10145737
[2004/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03024762
Date:27.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1429949
Date:23.06.2004
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1429949
Date:01.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:B61G5/04, B61G5/08
[2004/26]
CPC:
B61G5/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE [2005/22]
Former [2004/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANSCHLUSSELEMENT FÜR EIN KUPPLUNGSELEMENT EINER LUFTKUPPLUNG FÜR DEN EINSATZ IN ZUGKUPPLUNGEN, INSBESONDERE AUTOMATISCHEN ZUGKUPPLUNGEN[2004/26]
English:CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR A COUPLING ELEMENT OF A PNEUMATIC COUPLING FOR USE IN TRAIN COUPLINGS, ESPECIALLY AUTOMATIC TRAIN COUPLINGS[2004/26]
French:ELEMENT DE RACCORD POUR ELEMENT DE COUPLAGE D'UN COUPLAGE PNEUMATIQUE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS DES ATTELAGES DE TRAINS, NOTAMMENT DANS DES ATTELAGES DE TRAIN AUTOMATIQUES[2004/26]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2004National basic fee paid 
19.04.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/26]
19.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2005Fee for grant paid
29.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1548035  (KNORR BREMSE) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2056115  (MINI VERKEHRSWESEN) [A] 1 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 40; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE2228091  (KNORR BREMSE 1000 BERLIN UND 8) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE437979  (KNORR BREMSE AG) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.