EP1453607 - METHOD FOR TREATING A NUCLEAR GRAPHITE CONTAMINATED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARIS, Jacques 7, allée du Romarin F-30200 Bagnols/Ceze / FR | 02 /
COSTES, Jean-Raymond Les Majuranes F-84100 Uchaux / FR | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02799805.3 | 10.12.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002FR04254 | Priority number, date | FR20010015973 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0115973 | [2004/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049865 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1453607 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1453607 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B02C19/18, G21F9/30 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G21F9/30 (EP,US);
B02C19/18 (EP,US);
B02C2019/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KONTAMINIERTEM NUKLEAREM GRAPHIT | [2004/37] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING A NUCLEAR GRAPHITE CONTAMINATED | [2004/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN GRAPHITE NUCLEAIRE CONTAMINE | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 20.08.2005 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 10.10.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | LU | 10.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | FR | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 10.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | SI | 04.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1423592 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US3770212 (KASSIR G, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 8 - line 24 * * example - *; | [A]DD247858 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DD]) [A] 1,5 * page 3; figure . *; | [Y]FR2691524 (SERVITHEN SARL [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]DE19534232 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * |