blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1357597

EP1357597 - VOLTAGE CONVERTER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/44]VOLTAGE CONVERSION MODULE
[2008/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIGASHITANI, Hiroshi
335-1-A101, Komagatani
Habikino-shi, Osaka 583-0841 / JP
02 / HAYAMA, Masaaki
1-6-13-904, Saidaijikitamachi
Nara-shi, Nara 631-0817 / JP
03 / MIDO, Yuji
2-9-46, Kowakae
Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577-0818 / JP
 [2003/44]
Representative(s)Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al
Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Holmes, Miles, et al
Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date02800768.004.10.2002
[2003/44]
WO2002JP10361
Priority number, dateJP2001030959705.10.2001         Original published format: JP 2001309597
[2003/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03032389
Date:17.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1357597
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1357597
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.04.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2007
ClassificationIPC:H01L25/00, H05K3/46
[2003/44]
CPC:
H01L23/5389 (EP,US); H01L25/162 (EP,US); H01L25/165 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US); H01L2924/19105 (EP,US); H05K1/185 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10015 (EP,US); H05K2201/10022 (EP,US); H05K2201/1003 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/45]
Former [2003/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SPANNUNGSUMSETZUNGSMODUL[2003/44]
English:VOLTAGE CONVERTER MODULE[2008/23]
French:TRANSFORMATEUR ELECTRIQUE[2003/44]
Former [2003/44]VOLTAGE CONVERSION MODULE
Entry into regional phase04.07.2003Translation filed 
23.07.2003National basic fee paid 
23.07.2003Search fee paid 
23.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/44]
02.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2008Fee for grant paid
22.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
08.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US6038133  (NAKATANI SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP1111674  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * figure -; claim - *
International search[A]JPH0888474  (TAIYO YUDEN KK);
 [AP]JP2002233140  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.