Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1446881

EP1446881 - MOLDED/INTEGRATED TOUCH SWITCH/CONTROL PANEL ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TouchSensor Technologies, L.L.C.
203 North Gables Boulevard Wheaton
Illinois 60187 / US
[2013/12]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
TouchSensor Technologies, L.L.C.
203 North Gables Boulevard
Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CALDWELL, David, W.
11301 James Street
Holland, MI 49424 / US
02 / BIRD, Kevin C.
393 Windrift Way
Holland, MI 49424 / US
03 / SCHAEFER, William D.
2121 Finsbury Lane N. W.
Grand Rapid, MI 49504 / US
 [2004/34]
Representative(s)Somervell, Thomas Richard , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/12]Hackett, Sean James , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
Former [2007/25]Hackett, Sean James , et al
Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Former [2007/21]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
Former [2004/34]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date02803685.319.11.2002
[2004/34]
WO2002US37206
Priority number, dateUS20010334040P20.11.2001         Original published format: US 334040 P
US20010341350P18.12.2001         Original published format: US 341350 P
US20010341550P18.12.2001         Original published format: US 341550 P
US20010341551P18.12.2001         Original published format: US 341551 P
US2002027221915.10.2002         Original published format: US 272219
[2004/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03044958
Date:30.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1446881
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003
[2004/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1446881
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/96
[2004/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/34]
TitleGerman:FORM- BZW. INTEGRIERTE BERÜHRUNGSSCHALTER-/STEUERTAFELBAUGRUPPE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2004/34]
English:MOLDED/INTEGRATED TOUCH SWITCH/CONTROL PANEL ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME[2004/34]
French:ENSEMBLE PANNEAU DE COMMANDE/COMMUTATION A TOUCHES MOULEES/INTEGREES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2004/34]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2004National basic fee paid 
04.06.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.05.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/34]
20.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2013Fee for grant paid
08.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2013   
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 02  19.12.2013   
Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75
88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE
Opponent's representative
Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG
Stephanstraße 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2013   
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nurnberg / DE
 02  19.12.2013   
Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75
88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE
Opponent's representative
Diehl Patentabteilung
c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2014/05]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2013   
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nurnberg / DE
29.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.09.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition01.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2241/15
05.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
GB19.11.2013
IE19.11.2013
LU19.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
GB19.11.2013
IE19.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/51]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
GB19.11.2013
IE19.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
IE19.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
DK20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/47]BE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/44]BE20.03.2013
FI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/37]FI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/36]BG20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/34]BG20.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US5721666  (GIRARD LELAND K [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 7 - line 48 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 9; figures 5,6 *;
 [DX]US5594222  (CALDWELL DAVID W [US]) [DX] 1 * column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS5594222
 US5856646
 US6310611
 US6320282
 US5721666