Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1455952

EP1455952 - A PROCESS FOR MAKING DENSE THIN FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2011/18]For all designated states
The Regents of The University of California
1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
Former [2004/38]For all designated states
The Regents of The University of California
1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VISCO, Steven, J.
546 Arlington Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94720 / US
02 / DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C.
910 Acalanes Road
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
03 / JACOBSON, Craig P.
120 Ascot Ct. A
Moraga, CA 94556 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2005/01]01 / VISCO, Steven, J.
546 Arlington Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94720 / US
02 / DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C.
910 Acalanes Road
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
03 / JACOBSON, Craig P.
120 Ascot Ct.#A
Moraga, CA 94556 / US
Former [2004/38]01 / VISCO, Steven, J.
546 Arlington Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94720 / US
02 / DE JONGHE, Lutgard, C.
910 Acalanes Road
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
03 / JACOBSON, Craig P.
3545 Brook Street, Apartment A
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Hepworth Browne
15 St Paul's Street
Leeds LS1 2JG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB
Former [2007/02]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade
Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB
Former [2006/27]Browne, Robin Forsythe
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2004/38]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr.
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date02805216.518.12.2002
[2004/38]
WO2002US40703
Priority number, dateUS20010343294P18.12.2001         Original published format: US 343294 P
[2004/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03051529
Date:26.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1455952
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003
[2004/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1455952
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.06.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/12
[2009/09]
Former International [2004/38]B05D5/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/18]
Former [2004/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DICHTER DÜNNFILME[2004/38]
English:A PROCESS FOR MAKING DENSE THIN FILMS[2004/38]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES COUCHES MINCES DENSES[2004/38]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2004National basic fee paid 
21.05.2004Search fee paid 
21.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.05.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
16.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2011Fee for grant paid
22.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
TR04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
IE18.12.2011
LU18.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/29]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
IE18.12.2011
LU18.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/25]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
IE18.12.2011
LU18.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/49]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
IE18.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/47]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
IE18.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/33]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/23]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
IT04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2012/10]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2012/09]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
GR05.08.2011
ES15.08.2011
PT05.09.2011
Former [2011/47]PT05.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0109968  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-38,43 * claims 1-131 *;
 [A]US6051330  (FASANO BENJAMIN V [US], et al) [A] 1-38,43 * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]US5312582  (DONADO RAFAEL A [US]) [A] 1-38,43 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1026134  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-38,43 * paragraph [0005] *
International search[Y]US4279974  (NISHIO SHINJI)