Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1463823

EP1463823 - METHODS OF INCREASING ENDOGENOUS ERYTHROPOIETIN (EPO) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2016Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fibrogen, Inc.
409 Illinois Street
San Francisco, CA 94158 / US
[2011/18]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
FibroGen, Inc.
225 Gateway Boulevard
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KLAUS, Stephen, J.
1255 California Street, 702
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
02 / LIN, Al, Y.
7884 Pineville Circle
Castro Valley, CA 94552 / US
03 / NEFF, Thomas, B.
190 Glenwood Avenue
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
04 / WANG, Qingjian
2115 Everglades Place
Davis, CA 95616 / US
05 / GUENZLER-PUKALL, Volkmar
1408 Regent Drive
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
06 / AREND, Michael, P.
36 East 40th Avenue
Apartment E
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
07 / FLIPPIN, Lee, A.
17659 Skyline Boulevard
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
 [2013/10]
Former [2004/41]01 / KLAUS, Stephen, J.
1255 California Street, 702
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
02 / LIN, Al, Y.
7884 Pineville Circle
Castro Valley, CA 94552 / US
03 / NEFF, Thomas, B.
190 Glenwood Avenue
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
04 / WANG, Qingjian
2115 Everglades Place
Davis, CA 95616 / US
05 / GUENZLER-PUKALL, Volkmar
1408 Regent Drive
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
06 / AREND, Michael, P.
36 East 40th Avenue Apartment E
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
07 / FLIPPIN, Lee, A.
17659 Skyline Boulevard
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2008/46]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London
WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2004/41]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date02805548.106.12.2002
[2004/41]
WO2002US39163
Priority number, dateUS20010337082P06.12.2001         Original published format: US 337082 P
US20020349659P16.01.2002         Original published format: US 349659 P
US20020359683P25.02.2002         Original published format: US 359683 P
US20020386488P05.06.2002         Original published format: US 386488 P
[2004/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03053997
Date:03.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1463823
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003
[2004/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1463823
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.06.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/00, A61K31/17, C07K14/47, C07K14/505, A61K31/47, A61K31/4738, A61K31/63, G01N33/74, A61K38/17, C12N15/09, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/56, A61P7/06
[2012/44]
Former International [2005/46]A61K38/00, C12N15/09, C12Q1/56, C12Q1/34
Former International [2004/41]C12N15/90, C12Q1/56, C12Q1/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG VON ENDOGENEM ERYTHROPOETIN (EPO)[2004/41]
English:METHODS OF INCREASING ENDOGENOUS ERYTHROPOIETIN (EPO)[2004/41]
French:METHODES PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER L'ERYTHROPOIETINE ENDOGENE (EPO)[2004/41]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2004National basic fee paid 
06.07.2004Search fee paid 
06.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
04.10.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
22.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2012Fee for grant paid
17.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10181768.2  / EP2289531
EP10181796.3  / EP2298301
EP10181843.3  / EP2324834
EP19172616.5
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  10.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.
245 First Street Suite 1100
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
 [2014/52]
Former [2014/03]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  10.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Akebia Therapeutics, Inc.
9987 Carver Road, Suite 420
Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US
Opponent's representative
Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
16.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0787/16
16.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
22.10.2008Request for further processing filed
22.10.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.12.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/48]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2013/52]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/47]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/44]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
Former [2013/34]BG06.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0311322  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-30,32 * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]  - MAHON P C ET AL, "FIH-1: A novel protein that interacts with HIF-1alpha and VHL to mediate repression of HIF-1 transcriptional activity", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, NEW YORK, US, (20011015), vol. 15, no. 20, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 2675 - 2686, XP002254663

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.924501
 [A]  - GREGG L. SEMENZA, "Hypoxia-inducible factor 1: oxygen homeostasis and disease pathophysiology", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (200109), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 345 - 350, XP002338429

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4914(01)02090-1
 [A]  - SIREN A-L ET AL, "ERYTHROPOIETIN PREVENTS NEURONAL APOPTOSIS AFTER CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA AND METABOLIC STRESS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (20010327), vol. 98, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4044 - 4049, XP001148013

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.051606598
 [A]  - ALAFACI C ET AL, "EFFECT OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN ERYTROPOIETIN ON CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA FOLLOWING EXPERIMENTAL SUBARACHNOID HEMORRHAGE", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20001013), vol. 406, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 219 - 225, XP001018704

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(00)00691-9
 [A]  - BERNAUDIN M ET AL, "A POTENTIAL ROLE FOR ERYTHROPOIETIN IN FOCAL PERMANENT CEREBRAL ISCHEMIA IN MICE", JOURNAL OF CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW AND METABOLISM, RAVEN PRESS, LTD., NEW YORK, NY, US, (1999), vol. 19, ISSN 0271-678X, pages 643 - 651, XP002945970

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004647-199906000-00007
International search[Y]  - GUNZLER, V ET AL, "Time-dependent inactivatiobn of chick-embryo prolyl 4-hydroxylase by cournalic acid", BIOCHEM. JOURNAL, (1987), vol. 242, pages 163 - 169, XP002975232
 [Y]  - SAMIMI, A ET AL, "Mechanism of inhibition of lysyl hydroxylase activity by the organophosphates malathion and malaoxon", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 176, pages 181 - 186, XP002975233

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/taap.2001.9275
ExaminationDE10010423
 DE10010425
 DE10010426
 DE10010430
by applicant   - SAKANAKA, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 4635 - 4640
    - CELIK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 2258 - 2263
    - BRINES ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 10526 - 10531
    - CALAPAI ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 401, pages 349 - 356
    - SIREN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 4044 - 404
    - JACKSON; HUNT, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1983), vol. 96, pages 50 - 74
    - MAJAMAA ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (1985), vol. 229, pages 127 - 133
    - PALMERINI ET AL., J CHROMATOGR, (1985), vol. 339, pages 285 - 292
    - CUNLIFFE ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (1986), vol. 240, pages 617 - 619
    - KAULE; GUNZLER, ANAL BIOCHEM, (1990), vol. 184, pages 291 - 297