Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1484194

EP1484194 - TRANSFER METHOD AND TRANSFER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sugino, Nobuo
76-6, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]For all designated states
Sugino, Nobuo
76-6, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUGINO, Nobuo
76-6, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP
02 / SUGINO, Junko
76-6, Tokiwadai,Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0067 / JP
 [2004/50]
Representative(s)Midgley, Jonathan Lee , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Ltd
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans
Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/50]Midgley, Jonathan Lee , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2005/49]Midgley, Jonathan Lee , et al
Marks & Clerk, 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2004/50]Chisholm, Geoffrey David
Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date02807032.404.10.2002
[2004/50]
WO2002JP10359
Priority number, dateJP2002006656912.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002066569
JP2002010252904.04.2002         Original published format: JP 2002102529
JP2002017661618.06.2002         Original published format: JP 2002176616
[2004/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03076209
Date:18.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1484194
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search reportJP18.09.2003
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/17, B44C1/165, B41M5/025
[2008/36]
Former International [2004/50]B44C1/17
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRANSFERVERFAHREN UND TRANSFERBOGEN[2004/50]
English:TRANSFER METHOD AND TRANSFER SHEET[2004/50]
French:PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT ET FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT[2004/50]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2004Translation filed 
10.09.2004National basic fee paid 
10.09.2004Search fee paid 
10.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/50]
04.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/22]
10.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6017636  (TADA JUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 43 - column 7, line 39; figures 1a,1b,2-4 *;
 [X]EP0858913  (HUNT EUROP LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE2109992  (NISSHA PRINTING CO.) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 1 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 21 *
International search[Y]JPH11268493  (SHINZEN KK);
 [Y]JPH0811499  (TOMOE GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al);
 [Y]JP2000144584  (CHIISANA ROMANSU KK);
 [A]JPH1035194  (KOOU KOGEI KK);
 [A]US5555813  (HALE NATHAN [US], et al)