Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1564177

EP1564177 - ELEVATOR EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OGAWA, Koji, @c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2012/46]
Former [2005/33]01 / OGAWA, Koji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/46]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2005/33]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date02808157.818.11.2002
[2005/33]
WO2002JP11998
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004046009
Date:03.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1564177
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004
[2005/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1564177
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.06.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:B66B7/06
[2005/33]
Designated contracting statesDE [2006/10]
Former [2005/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUFZUGSEINRICHTUNG[2005/33]
English:ELEVATOR EQUIPMENT[2005/33]
French:EQUIPEMENT D'ELEVATEUR[2005/33]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2004Translation filed 
23.07.2004National basic fee paid 
23.07.2004Search fee paid 
23.07.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2004Examination requested  [2005/33]
25.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2012Fee for grant paid
26.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.08.2013  08.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
thyssenkrupp Elevator AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
m patent group, et al
Postfach 33 04 29
80064 München / DE
 [2018/31]
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  02.08.2013  08.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Elevator AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte, et al
Postfach 33 04 29
80064 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition27.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0197/16
05.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]US1911834  (LEONARD LINDQUIST DAVID) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 77 - page 2, line 78 * [A] 5;
 [XA]JP2000351556  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4,5;
 [A]US1896776  (JAMES HENRY D) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *
International search[X]JPH07187525  (MASAMI SAKITA);
 [X]JPS59133188  (TOSHIBA KK);
 [A]JPH02106570  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPS58220075  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP)
by applicantJPS59133188
 US1911834