Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1331444

EP1331444 - Method for regulating a gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vaillant GmbH
Berghauser Strasse 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
[2003/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Bomscheuer, Walter
Forstmannstrasse 34
45239 Essen / DE
02 / Klepka, Michael
Mühlenfeld 58
42369 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Richter, Klaus
Paulstrasse 11
42853 Remscheid / DE
 [2003/31]
Representative(s)Popp, Carsten , et al
Vaillant GmbH
IR-IP
Berghauser Straße 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Hocker, Thomas
Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
Former [2003/31]Hocker, Thomas
Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40
42859 Remscheid / DE
Application number, filing date03000375.010.01.2003
[2003/31]
Priority number, dateAT2002000006817.01.2002         Original published format: AT 682002
[2003/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1331444
Date:30.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1331444
Date:12.11.2003
[2003/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1331444
Date:22.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:F23N1/02, F23N5/00, F23N5/12
[2003/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/31]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Regelung eines Gasbrenners[2003/31]
English:Method for regulating a gas burner[2003/31]
French:Méthode de régulation d'un brûleur à gaz[2003/31]
Examination procedure02.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/49]
09.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2012Fee for grant paid
09.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.05.2013   
LAMTEC Mess- und Regeltechnik GmbH & Co.KG
Wiesenstrasse 6
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 02  22.05.2013  14.10.2015  WITHDRAWN
Siemens Schweiz AG
Freilagerstrasse 40
8047 Zürich / CH
Opponent's representative
Varekamp, Robin
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [2015/47]
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.2013   
LAMTEC Mess- und Regeltechnik GmbH & Co.KG
Wiesenstrasse 6
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 02  22.05.2013  28.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Schweiz AG
Freilagerstrasse 40
8047 Zürich / CH
Opponent's representative
Varekamp, Robin
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2013/27]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.2013   
LAMTEC Mess- und Regeltechnik GmbH & Co.KG
Wiesenstrasse 6
69190 Walldorf / DE
 02  22.05.2013  28.05.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Schweiz AG
Freilagerstrasse 40
8047 Zürich / CH
Opponent's representative
Varekamp, Robin
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2013/26]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.2013   
LAMTEC Mess- und Regeltechnik GmbH & Co.KG
Wiesenstrasse 6
69190 Walldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0138/16
29.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.05.2008Appeal received No.  T1674/08
31.07.2008Statement of grounds filed
14.09.2011Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
08.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
05.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
19.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.01.2003
CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
PT24.12.2012
IE10.01.2013
LU10.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/07]CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
PT24.12.2012
IE10.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
PT24.12.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/34]CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
BG22.11.2012
GR23.11.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/22]CY22.08.2012
CZ22.08.2012
EE22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/13]CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
PT24.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SE22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
Former [2013/11]CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
SI22.08.2012
GR23.11.2012
Former [2013/10]CY22.08.2012
FI22.08.2012
Former [2013/09]FI22.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19539568  (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US5190454  (MURRAY STUART W [US], et al) [YD] 1-13 * column 5, line 3 - line 43; figure 1 *;
 [AD]EP0833106  (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [AD] * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19941978  (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] * column 2, line 7 - line 36 * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *
by applicantEP0770824
 EP0833106
 US5190454